EP1428552 - ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY FOR ELECTROTHERAPY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDIBA, S.A. Enamorats, 17-19 08013 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states INDIBA, S.A. Enamorados, 17-19 E-08013 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALBET BENACH, José Indiba, S.A., Enamorats, 17-19 08013 Barcelona / ES | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Pastells Teixido, Manuel, et al Morgades, Del Rio, Renter, S.L. Rector Ubach, 37-39, bjs. 2 08021 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Pastells Teixido, Manuel, et al Morgades, Del Rio, Renter, S.L. Rector Ubach, 37-39, bjs. 2 08021 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2004/25] | Pastells Teixido, Manuel c/o PASTELLS & ARAGONES, S.L., Pau Claris, 138 5o 1a 08009 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 02772418.6 | 17.09.2002 | [2004/25] | WO2002ES00435 | Priority number, date | ES20010002327U | 21.09.2001 Original published format: ES 200102327 U | ES20020002227U | 13.09.2002 Original published format: ES 200202227 U | [2004/25] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03024524 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1428552 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/06 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
A61N1/0408 (EP,US);
A61N1/06 (KR);
A61N1/0472 (EP,US);
A61N1/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG FÜR ELEKTROTHERAPEUTISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2004/25] | English: | ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY FOR ELECTROTHERAPY DEVICES | [2004/25] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ELECTRODES POUR APPAREILS D'ELECTROTHERAPIE | [2004/25] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2003 | Translation filed | 23.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2003 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 06.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]ES1008193U ; | [A]EP0480639 (YAMADA SHIRO [JP]); | [Y]ES1050231U (INDIBA SA [ES]) |