EP1438239 - SOLID, LIQUID OR GASEOUS PHASE MIXER, USING SIMULTANEOUS OR PROLONGED RELEASE OF SEVERAL INTEGRAL SEALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wattebled, Patrick Le Rocher du Devin F-84360 Lauris / FR | [2004/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/30] | Application number, filing date | 02772447.5 | 24.07.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002FR02637 | Priority number, date | FR20010010066 | 27.07.2001 Original published format: FR 0110066 | [2004/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03011711 | Date: | 13.02.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1438239 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/32 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
B65D81/3294 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FEST-, FLÜSSIG- ODER GASPHASENMISCHER UNTER VERWENDUNG GLEICHZEITIGER ODER VERZÖGERTER FREIGABE VON MEHREREN INTEGRALEN VERSCHLÜSSEN | [2004/30] | English: | SOLID, LIQUID OR GASEOUS PHASE MIXER, USING SIMULTANEOUS OR PROLONGED RELEASE OF SEVERAL INTEGRAL SEALS | [2004/30] | French: | MELANGEUR DE PHASES SOLIDES, LIQUIDES OU GAZEUSES, UTILISANT LA LIBERATION CONCOMITANTE OU DIFFEREE DE PLUSIEURS OPERCULAGES SOLIDAIRES | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 15.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.10.2005 | 31.07.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DXY]WO9419257 (THUES MARIA ;FALCONE SAVINO (BE)) [DX] 1,2 * figures 1A-1D,3,6A-6D,7A-7C,9 * [Y] 3; | [DYA]US3057536 (WARNSDORFER JR CLIFFORD J ET AL) [DY] 3 * figures 1-9 * [A] 1,2; | [DX]JPH09240751 | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09240751 A 19970916 (KAO CORP) [DX] 1 * abstract * * figures 1-8B * |