EP1435066 - MANAGEMENT OF BYTE TRANSMISSION IN A SMARTCARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axalto S.A. 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | For:MC
Schlumberger Malco, Inc. 9800 Reistertown Road Owings Mills, MD 21117 / US | [2004/40] |
Former [2004/28] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER Systèmes 50, avenue Jean Jaurès 92120 Montrouge / FR | ||
For:MC
Schlumberger Malco, Inc. 9800 Reistertown Road Owings Mills, MD 21117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENNECART, José 105 rue du Beau Soleil F-45370 Dry / FR | 02 /
GIEN, Christophe 22 allée des Erables F-45650 Saint Jean le Blanc / FR | [2004/28] | Representative(s) | Cassagne, Philippe M.J., et al Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Cassagne, Philippe M.J., et al Axalto SA IP & Licensing Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/07] | Cassagne, Philippe M.J. Axalto S.A. 50, avenue Jean Jaurès BP 620 12 92542 Montrouge Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02772721.3 | 10.10.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002IB04159 | Priority number, date | FR20010013068 | 10.10.2001 Original published format: FR 0113068 | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03032244 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1435066 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1435066 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/073, G06K7/00 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
G06K7/10297 (EP,US);
G06K19/073 (EP,KR,US);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BYTE-ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERWALTUNG IN EINER CHIPKARTE | [2004/28] | English: | MANAGEMENT OF BYTE TRANSMISSION IN A SMARTCARD | [2004/28] | French: | GESTION DE TRANSMISSION DES MULTIPLETS DANS UNE CARTE INTELLIGENTE | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 09.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2006 | BE | 02.08.2006 | CH | 02.08.2006 | CY | 02.08.2006 | CZ | 02.08.2006 | EE | 02.08.2006 | FI | 02.08.2006 | IT | 02.08.2006 | LI | 02.08.2006 | NL | 02.08.2006 | SK | 02.08.2006 | TR | 02.08.2006 | IE | 10.10.2006 | LU | 10.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | BG | 02.11.2006 | DK | 02.11.2006 | SE | 02.11.2006 | GR | 03.11.2006 | ES | 13.11.2006 | PT | 02.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
TR | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 10.10.2006 | ||
LU | 10.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
EE | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 10.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 10.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
GR | 03.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
IE | 10.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
IT | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
BE | 02.08.2006 | ||
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
SK | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
PT | 02.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 02.08.2006 | |
CH | 02.08.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
CZ | 02.08.2006 | ||
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
DK | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
NL | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
BG | 02.11.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CH | 02.08.2006 | |
FI | 02.08.2006 | ||
LI | 02.08.2006 | ||
SE | 02.11.2006 | ||
ES | 13.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0881590 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-10,12,13 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 39 * * column 5, line 31 - column 7, line 12 * * figures 2,3 * * claim 1 * [Y] 5,11; | [XY]DE19928939 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7-9,13 * column 1, line 28 - line 51 * * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 50 * * figure 1 * [Y] 5,11; | [A]WO0116865 (CRYPTEC SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-13* page 19, line 5 - line 19; figure 5 *; | [A]EP1109129 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 13 - line 39; claim 2 *; | [X]FR2806505 (SCHLUMBERGER SYSTEMS & SERVICE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,12,13 * page 19, line 13 - page 20, line 21; figure 7 * |