EP1454217 - APPARATUS, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD, FOR FACILITATING QOS AND BEARER SETUP IN AN IP-BASED COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures I LLC 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states Intellectual Ventures I LLC 3150 139th Avenue SE, Building 4 Bellevue WA 98005 / US | ||
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Spyder Navigations L.L.C. 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | ||
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHENG, Haihong 136 Bricknell Lane Coppell, TX 75019 / US | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2015/47] |
Former [2010/22] | Small, Gary James, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/37] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02772733.8 | 11.10.2002 | [2004/37] | WO2002IB04187 | Priority number, date | US20010992790 | 05.11.2001 Original published format: US 992790 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03040895 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1454217 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1454217 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04W76/02 | [2015/18] | CPC: |
H04L63/0892 (EP,US);
H04L67/61 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/44] | H04L29/08 | ||
Former IPC [2004/37] | G06F1/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2004/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND ZUGEORDNETES VERFAHREN ZUM ERMÖGLICHEN VON QOS UND TRÄGEREINRICHTUNG IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM AUF IP-BASIS | [2004/37] | English: | APPARATUS, AND ASSOCIATED METHOD, FOR FACILITATING QOS AND BEARER SETUP IN AN IP-BASED COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2004/37] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE DESTINES A FACILITER LA CONFIGURATION DE LA QUALITE DE SERVICE (QOS) ET LA CONFIGURATION DU SUPPORT DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION IP | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 03.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 15.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   06.11.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.2015 | BE | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | DK | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | ES | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | IT | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | NL | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | TR | 18.11.2015 | GR | 19.02.2016 | PT | 18.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 18.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1047244 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,15-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [00 5] - [0020] - [0 28] - [0032] - [0 39] - [0051] - [0 58] - [0066] - [0 69] - [0082] * [Y] 4-14; | [Y] - PAT R CALHOUN SUN LABORATORIES ET AL, "Diameter Mobile IP Extensions; draft-calhoun-diameter-mobileip-12.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20010201), no. 12, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015011395 [Y] 4-14 * abstract * * figure 2 * * page 3, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 3 * | [A] - STEFANO FACCIN FRANCK LE SRINIVAS SREEMANTHULA HAIHONG ZHENG NOKIA RESEARCH CENTER, "Profile Management Framework and Diameter Profile Management Application; draft-zheng-diameter-pma-00.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20011101), ISSN 0000-0004, XP015037434 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 1 * | International search | [YP]US2002114305 (OYAMA JOHNSON [SE], et al); | [YP]US2002147021 (JUNE SEUNG [KR]) |