EP1431682 - PULSE TUBE REFRIGERATING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Central Japan Railway Company 1-1-4, Meieki, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 450-6101 / JP | [2010/01] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Aisin Seiki Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITA, Hideo 12-17, Higashimyodaiji-cho Okazaki-shi, Aichi 444-0863 / JP | 02 /
GOTOU, Tetuya 1-18-26, Nagono, Nishi-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 451-0042 / JP | 03 /
IGARASHI, Motohiro Central Japan Railway Company 1-1-4, Meieki, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 450-6101 / JP | 04 /
FURUSAWA, Takayuki Central Japan Railway Company 1-1-4, Meieki, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 450-6101 / JP | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02772824.5 | 29.08.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002JP08733 | Priority number, date | JP20010262282 | 30.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001262282 | [2004/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03019087 | Date: | 06.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1431682 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F25B9/14 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
F25B9/145 (EP,US);
F25B2309/1408 (EP,US);
F25B2309/1412 (EP,US);
F25B2309/1414 (EP,US);
F25B2309/1418 (EP,US);
F25B2309/1424 (EP,US);
F25D19/006 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | F25B9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | PULSATIONSROHRKÜHLMASCHINE | [2004/26] | English: | PULSE TUBE REFRIGERATING MACHINE | [2004/26] | French: | MACHINE DE REFRIGERATION POUR TUBE DE PULSATION | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2004 | Translation filed | 26.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 06.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 01.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/34] | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05312423 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [X]JPH07180938 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,3,13-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0672873 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 1,3,13 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH0854151 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,3,13-15 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH094936 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2000018742 (AISIN SEIKI) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2000035253 (AISIN SEIKI) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2000074518 (AISIN SEIKI) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2000161801 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,3,13-18 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH04268167 (AISIN SEIKI); | [X]JPH06137696 (ECTI KK); | [X]JPH03194364 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JPH08271071 (AISIN SEIKI); | [Y]JPH0854151 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2000055491 (IDOTAI TSUSHIN SENTAN GIJUTSU) | Examination | - RICHARDSON ET AL, "Pulse tube refrigerator - an alternative cryocooler?", CRYOGENICS, ELSEVIER, KIDLINGTON, GB, vol. 26, no. 6, doi:10.1016/0011-2275(86)90062-7, ISSN 0011-2275, (19860601), pages 331 - 340, (19860601), XP024049683 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0011-2275(86)90062-7 | by applicant | JPH094936 | JP2000161801 | JPH0854141 |