EP1427490 - GAMING DEVICE HAVING BONUS GAME TERMINATOR THAT ACTIVATES A MECHANICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IGT 9295 Prototype Drive Reno, Nevada 89511-8986 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states IGT 9295 Prototype Drive Reno, Nevada 89511-8986 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBB, Bayard, S. 3215 Palacio Court Sparks, NV 89436 / US | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/25] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02773417.7 | 16.09.2002 | [2004/25] | WO2002US29399 | Priority number, date | US20010960788 | 21.09.2001 Original published format: US 960788 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03027797 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1427490 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A63F5/00, G07F17/32 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
G07F17/3244 (EP,US);
G07F17/3202 (EP,US);
G07F17/3211 (EP,US);
G07F17/3213 (EP,US);
G07F17/3216 (EP,US);
G07F17/3267 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/25] | A63F5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPIELVORRICHTUNG MIT BONUSSPIELTERMINATOR, DER EINE MECHANISCHE VORRICHTUNG AKTIVIERT | [2004/25] | English: | GAMING DEVICE HAVING BONUS GAME TERMINATOR THAT ACTIVATES A MECHANICAL DEVICE | [2004/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE JEU COMPRENANT UN TERMINATEUR DE JEU A BONUS ACTIVANT UN DISPOSITIF MECANIQUE | [2004/25] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 16.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 22.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5882261 (ADAMS WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1-83* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0945837 (WMS GAMING INC [US]) [Y] 1-83 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * figures 8,9 *; | [X]WO0114030 (AC COIN AND SLOT SERVICE COMPA [US], et al) [X] 1-83 * abstract * * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 17 * * page 17, line 21 - page 18, line 12 * * claims 1-85 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0119476 (INT GAME TECH [US], et al) [A] 1-83 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 51 *; | [Y]US2001003709 (ADAMS WILLIAM R [US]) [Y] 1-83 * the whole document * | International search | [YP]US6190255 (THOMAS ALFRED [US], et al); | [Y]US5823874 (ADAMS WILLIAM R [US]); | [Y]US5788573 (BAERLOCHER ANTHONY J [US], et al); | [YP]US6309300 (GLAVICH PAULINA [US]); | [AP]US6338678 (SEELIG JERALD C [US], et al); | [AP]US6450884 (SEELIG JERALD C [US], et al); | [YP]US6328649 (RANDALL DOV L [GB], et al); | [Y]US6159098 (SLOMIANY SCOTT [US], et al); | [Y]US6142873 (WEISS STEVEN A [US], et al) |