EP1442563 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DSL POWER SAVING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciena Corporation 1201 Winterson Road Linthicum, MD 21090 / US | [2005/33] |
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states Catena Networks, Inc. Suite 600, 303 Twin Dolphins Drive Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECZKY, Andrew 732 Highland Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K0A 2K7 / CA | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [2004/32] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02773821.0 | 18.10.2002 | [2004/32] | WO2002US33559 | Priority number, date | CA20012359305 | 19.10.2001 Original published format: CA 2359305 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03034185 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1442563 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26, H04L25/03, H03F3/04, H04M19/00 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
H04L5/0046 (EP,US);
H04L1/0017 (EP,US);
H04L5/006 (EP,US);
H04L5/0064 (EP,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/32] | H04L12/26, H04L25/03, H03F3/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DSL-ENERGIEERSPARNIS | [2004/32] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DSL POWER SAVING | [2004/32] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE GESTION DE LA CONSOMMATION DANS UN SYSTEME DE LIGNE D'ABONNE NUMERIQUE (DSL) | [2004/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 26.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6028486 (ANDRE TORE [SE]); | [A]US6035000 (BINGHAM JOHN A C [US]); | [A]US6266348 (GROSS RICHARD W [US], et al) | Examination | EP0991223 | by applicant | EP0991223 |