EP1454282 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF COMPONENTS OF MAMMALIAN BIOCHEMICAL NETWORKS AS TARGETS FOR THERAPEUTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENE NETWORK SCIENCES, INC 2359 N. Triphamer Road Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [2004/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILL, Colin 101 Giles Street, Apt. A Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | 02 /
KHALIL, Iya 35 Sheraton Drive Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02773968.9 | 04.11.2002 | [2004/37] | WO2002US35301 | Priority number, date | US20010335999P | 02.11.2001 Original published format: US 335999 P | US20020406764P | 29.08.2002 Original published format: US 406764 P | US20020286372 | 01.11.2002 Original published format: US 286372 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03040992 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1454282 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06G7/48, G06G7/58, G01N33/48, G01N33/50 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/5091 (EP);
G16B5/30 (EP,US);
G16B5/00 (EP);
G01N2333/4739 (EP);
G01N2800/52 (EP);
G16B5/10 (EP,US);
G16B5/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN VON KOMPONENTEN VON BIOCHEMISCHEN NETZWERKEN FÜR SÄUGETIERE ALS TARGETS FÜR THERAPEUTISCHE MITTEL | [2004/37] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF COMPONENTS OF MAMMALIAN BIOCHEMICAL NETWORKS AS TARGETS FOR THERAPEUTIC AGENTS | [2004/37] | French: | PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER DES COMPOSANTS DE RESEAUX BIOCHIMIQUES MAMMALIENS COMME ETANT DES CIBLES D'AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 18.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 18.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/27] | Request for further processing for: | 08.08.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]WO02065119 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) [PA] 1-65 * the whole document *; | [XY] - HUANG SUI, "Gene expression profiling, genetic networks, and cellular states: An integrating concept for tumorigenesis and drug discovery", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR MEDICINE, SPRINGER VERLAG, DE, (199906), vol. 77, no. 6, ISSN 0946-2716, pages 469 - 480, XP002205218 [X] 30-33 * the whole document * [Y] 25,37,47,59,65 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s001099900023 | [XY] - IDEKER T ET AL, "Integrated genomic and proteomic analyses of a systematically perturbed metabolic network", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (20010504), vol. 292, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 929 - 934, XP002963505 [X] 1-5,7,8,11,12,15-17,19,21 * the whole document * [Y] 25,37,47,59,65 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.292.5518.929 | [A] - SCHUSTER STEFAN ET AL, "A general definition of metabolic pathways useful for systematic organization and analysis of complex metabolic networks", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200003), vol. 18, no. 3, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 326 - 332, XP002316686 [A] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/73786 | [A] - SCHERF U ET AL, "A gene expression database for the molecular pharmacology of cancer", NATURE GENETICS, NATURE AMERICA, NEW YORK, US, (200003), vol. 24, no. 3, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 236 - 244, XP002224798 [A] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/73439 | [A] - HASTY JEFF ET AL, "Computational studies of gene regulatory networks: In numero molecular biology", NATURE REVIEWS GENETICS, (200104), vol. 2, no. 4, ISSN 1471-0056, pages 268 - 279, XP002316687 [A] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35066056 | [PX] - WAGNER A, "How to reconstruct a large genetic network from n gene perturbations in fewer than n2 easy steps", BIOINFORMATICS, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, OXFORD,, GB, (2001), vol. 17, no. 12, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 1183 - 1197, XP002973480 [PX] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/17.12.1183 | [PX] - SOMOGYI ROLAND ET AL, "The dynamics of molecular networks: Applications to therapeutic discovery.", DRUG DISCOVERY TODAY, (2001), vol. 6, no. 24, ISSN 1359-6446, pages 1267 - 1277, XP002316688 [PX] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1359-6446(01)02096-7 | [PX] - SHMULEVICH ILYA ET AL, "Gene perturbation and intervention in Probabilistic Boolean Networks.", BIOINFORMATICS (OXFORD), (200210), vol. 18, no. 10, ISSN 1367-4803, pages 1319 - 1331, XP002316689 [PX] 1-65 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/18.10.1319 | International search | [Y]US5914891 (MCADAMS HARLEY H [US], et al); | [Y]US5930154 (THALHAMMER-REYERO CRISTINA [US]); | [X]US5965352 (STOUGHTON ROLAND [US], et al); | [Y]US6132969 (STOUGHTON ROLAND [US], et al); | [X]US6165709 (FRIEND STEPHEN H [US], et al); | [Y]US6203987 (FRIEND STEPHEN H [US], et al); | [Y]WO0180151 (HYBRIGENICS SA [FR], et al); | [XP]US2002019705 (KAUFFMAN STUART A [US], et al); | [XP]US2002068269 (ALLEN ERIC B [US], et al); | [X] - TOMITA ET AL., "E-cell: software environment for whole-cell-simulation", BIOINFORMATICS, (1999), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 72 - 84, XP000961128 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/15.1.72 | [Y] - BADER ET AL., "BIND- the biomolecular interaction network database", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 242 - 245, XP002962843 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/29.1.242 | [Y] - VOIT ET AL., "Biochemical systems analysis of genome wide expression data", BIOINFORMATICS, (2000), vol. 16, no. 11, pages 1023 - 1037, XP002962844 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/16.11.1023 | [Y] - GORYANIN ET AL., "Mathematical simulation and analysis of cellular metabolism and regulation", BIOINFORMATICS, (1999), vol. 15, no. 9, pages 749 - 758, XP002190906 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bioinformatics/15.9.749 |