EP1390956 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LIMITING A RAY BEAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLANMECA OY Asentajankatu 6 00880 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Planmeca OY Asentajankatu 6 00880 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2004/09] | For all designated states Planmeca OY Asentajankatu 6 00880 Helsinki / FI | ||
For all designated states De Godzinsky, Christian skuggbacken 4 01260 Vanda / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE GODZINSKY, Christian Skuggbacken 4 FIN-01260 Vanda / FI | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/40] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/34] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/09] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02774035.6 | 29.05.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002FI00461 | Priority number, date | FI20010001119 | 29.05.2001 Original published format: FI 20011119 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02097827 | Date: | 05.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1390956 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1390956 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G21K1/04, A61B6/06 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
A61B6/06 (EP,US);
G21K1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BEGRENZEN EINES STRAHLS | [2004/09] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LIMITING A RAY BEAM | [2004/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DESTINES A LIMITER UN FAISCEAU DE RAYONS | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 24.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 08.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | SE | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | GR | 06.01.2012 | ES | 16.01.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | IE | 29.05.2012 | LU | 29.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3236082 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US5396533 (HOLZERMER GUENTER [DE]); | [Y]GB2291326 (JENOPTIK TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]DE29710724U (MUELLER WULF [DE], et al) |