EP1430224 - CONNECTING ELEMENT FOR CONNECTING A PISTON TO A RESTORING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WERNER, Martin Thonlohe 29 93155 Hemau / DE | 02 /
BUCHHAUSER, Wolfgang Im Ebnet 18 93356 Teugn / DE | 03 /
KLESSE, Christoph Schwarzer Helm 76 93086 Woerth A. D. Donau / DE | 04 /
GROSSNER, Thomas Hans-Sachs-Strasse 16 93073 Neutraubling / DE | 05 /
EINBERGER, Adolf Bergstr. 2 84326 Rimbach / DE | [2004/26] | Application number, filing date | 02774375.6 | 16.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002DE03458 | Priority number, date | DE2001147981 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10147981 | [2004/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03031816 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1430224 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1430224 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/053, // (F03C1/053, F02M39:00) | [2004/26] | CPC: |
F04B1/0426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/03] |
Former [2004/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSELEMENT ZUR VERBINDUNG EINES KOLBENS MIT EINEM RÜCKSTELLELEMENT | [2004/26] | English: | CONNECTING ELEMENT FOR CONNECTING A PISTON TO A RESTORING ELEMENT | [2004/26] | French: | ELEMENT D'ASSEMBLAGE POUR ASSEMBLER UN PISTON ET UN ELEMENT DE RAPPEL | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 19.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.09.2005 | FR | 30.09.2005 | [2008/45] |
Former [2007/34] | IT | 16.09.2005 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5571243 (ARNOLD BERNHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE19650246 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0851120 (ELASIS SISTEMA RICERCA FIAT [IT]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]US6176223 (KUHN UWE [DE], et al) [X] 1-4* the whole document * |