EP1423486 - COMPOSITION FOR DETACHABLE DECORATIVE COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2006/40] |
Former [2004/23] | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÖTTMER, Bernhard Lottenstrasse 49 40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
RIEMENSCHNEIDER, Horst Schmiedestrasse 8 59427 Unna / DE | 03 /
FANDEL, Thomas Pappelweg 5 59423 Unna / DE | 04 /
SATTLER, Hans-Peter Kupferberg 54 59174 Kamen / DE | [2004/23] | Application number, filing date | 02774529.8 | 22.08.2002 | [2004/23] | WO2002EP09372 | Priority number, date | DE2001142135 | 30.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10142135 | [2004/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03020838 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1423486 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1423486 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C09D201/00, C09D101/28, C09D5/20, E04F13/00 | [2004/23] | CPC: |
E04F13/02 (EP);
C09D101/28 (EP);
C09D201/00 (EP);
C09D5/20 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09D101/28, C08L2666/02, C08L2666/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/23] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR WIEDERABLÖSBARE DEKORATIVE BESCHICHTUNGEN | [2004/23] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR DETACHABLE DECORATIVE COATINGS | [2004/23] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR REVETEMENTS DECORATIFS AMOVIBLES | [2004/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/23] | 04.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.10.2006 | CZ | 04.10.2006 | EE | 04.10.2006 | FI | 04.10.2006 | FR | 04.10.2006 | IE | 04.10.2006 | IT | 04.10.2006 | SK | 04.10.2006 | TR | 04.10.2006 | BG | 04.01.2007 | DK | 04.01.2007 | SE | 04.01.2007 | GR | 05.01.2007 | ES | 15.01.2007 | PT | 16.03.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 04.10.2006 | |
CZ | 04.10.2006 | ||
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
FR | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
FR | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
EE | 04.10.2006 | ||
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
GR | 05.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
FR | 25.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
SK | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IE | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | CZ | 04.10.2006 | |
FI | 04.10.2006 | ||
IT | 04.10.2006 | ||
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
DK | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 04.10.2006 | |
BG | 04.01.2007 | ||
SE | 04.01.2007 | ||
ES | 15.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | ES | 15.01.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]RU2147594 ; | [A]SU1470753 ; | [A]GB773338 (MO OCH DOMSJOE AB); | [X]DE1224191 (EUGENE SIMON) [X] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [X]US3583932 (BENTON RICHARD E, et al) [X] 1-5 * column 4, line 25 - line 51 *; | [X]DE19733166 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11 * page 5, line 34 - page 8 *; | [A] - DUGUEV S V ET AL., "Method of preparing powdery paint", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 02, Database accession no. 2001-014007, XP002225222 & RU2147594 A 20000420 (DOK FIRM CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - IZMAILOVA P A ET AL., "Composition for temporary coating", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 25, Database accession no. 1990-020768, XP002225223 & SU1470753 A 19890407 (ACCOUNTING BUSINESS MACH) [A] * abstract * | Examination | DE4201800 | WO9955769 |