EP1430096 - PROPYLENE POLYMER BASED COMPOUNDS AND HEAT-SEALABLE MULTI-LAYER SHEETS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innovene Manufacturing Belgium NV Scheldelaan 482 2040 Antwerpen / BE | [2005/38] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states BP Belgium N.V. Uitbreidingstraat 60-62 2600 Berchem / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COPPINI, Valerio 5, rue E. Hulin F-57430 Sarralbe / FR | 02 /
CUYPERS, Herve, Joseph, Gislain Avenue des Fauvettes 1 B-1341 Ceroux-Mousty / BE | 03 /
LHOST, Olivier rue Salvador Allende, 127 B-7021 Havre / BE | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road Chertsey Surrey, KT16 8LA / GB | ||
Former [2006/33] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al COMPASS PATENT LLP Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | ||
Former [2005/25] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al O & D Trading Limited Patents and Agreements Compass Point 79-87 Kingston Road Staines, Middlesex TW18 1DT / GB | ||
Former [2004/26] | Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al BP International Limited, Group Patents & Agreements, Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames, Middlesex TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 02774641.1 | 23.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002EP10678 | Priority number, date | EP20010203685 | 26.09.2001 Original published format: EP 01203685 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03029346 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1430096 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1430096 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/14 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/14, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHUNG VON POLYPROPYLEN VERBINDUNGEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE THERMOSCHWEISSBARE MEHRSCHICHTPLATTEN | [2004/26] | English: | PROPYLENE POLYMER BASED COMPOUNDS AND HEAT-SEALABLE MULTI-LAYER SHEETS CONTAINING THEM | [2004/26] | French: | COMPOSES A BASE DE POLYMERE PROPYLENE ET FEUILLES MULTICOUCHES THERMOSCELLABLES LES CONTENANT | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 10.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2006 | CH | 10.05.2006 | CY | 10.05.2006 | CZ | 10.05.2006 | EE | 10.05.2006 | FI | 10.05.2006 | LI | 10.05.2006 | SK | 10.05.2006 | BG | 10.08.2006 | DK | 10.08.2006 | SE | 10.08.2006 | IE | 25.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | PT | 10.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/31] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
BG | 10.08.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
EE | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
IE | 25.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
IT | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SK | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 10.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DX]GB2116989 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO) [DX] 1-17* page 1, column 2, line 112; example A5 *; | [DX]EP0679686 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DX] 1-17 * examples 1,C-2 * |