EP1417381 - DEVICE FOR PROTECTION AGAINST FLUID FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CBM Conception Pour Le Batiment et La Maison 51, rue de Morat 68000 Colmar / FR | [2004/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEILER, Luc 9, rue des Larrons F-68500 Guebwiller / FR | [2004/20] | Representative(s) | Burkard, Thierry 40 rue de Stalingrad 68100 Mulhouse / FR | [2004/20] | Application number, filing date | 02774839.1 | 26.07.2002 | [2004/20] | WO2002FR02676 | Priority number, date | FR20010009983 | 26.07.2001 Original published format: FR 0109983 | [2004/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03010389 | Date: | 06.02.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1417381 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E02B7/22, E02B3/10 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
E02B7/22 (EP);
E02B3/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/20] | Extension states | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ VOR FLUIDSTRÖMUNG | [2004/20] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROTECTION AGAINST FLUID FLOW | [2004/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE L'ECOULEMENT DE FLUIDES | [2004/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 03.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/30] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2005 | 31.07.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2006 | 31.07.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2007 | 31.07.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   19.01.2008 | 31.07.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0163292 (KOSSBIEL ERNST) [X] 1-4,6 * the whole document * [Y] 5,8; | [YA]FR2601054 (MATERIEL SECURITE URB) [Y] 5,8 * page 4, line 3 - line 38; figure - * [A] 1,4,6; | [A]DE29504288U (IBS INDUSTRIEBARRIEREN UND PRO) [A] 2,3 * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4; figure . *; | [A]DE19649868 (WBS SYSTEME WERNER BANK GMBH) [A] 1,4-6 * column 5, line 51 - line 59 * * column 6, line 31 - line 60; figure - * |