EP1444392 - JACQUARD FABRIC PRODUCED ON A WEFT KNITTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXTILES ET PLASTIQUES CHOMARAT 07160 Le Cheylard / FR | For all designated states S.I.C.A.T - Société Industrielle de Création et Applications Textiles 5, place Croix-Paquet 69001 Lyon / FR | [2004/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAULT, Jean-Michel Haute Croix F-07160 Mariac / FR | 02 /
VIDAL, Gérard 26, route Salaize F-38150 Roussillon / FR | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2004/33] | Vuillermoz, Bruno Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69131 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02774920.9 | 10.09.2002 | [2004/33] | WO2002FR03070 | Priority number, date | FR20010014612 | 12.11.2001 Original published format: FR 0114612 | [2004/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03042442 | Date: | 22.05.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1444392 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | D04B1/10 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
D04B1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AN EINER SCHUSS-STRICKMASCHINE HERGESTELLTE JACQUARDSTRICKWARE | [2004/33] | English: | JACQUARD FABRIC PRODUCED ON A WEFT KNITTING MACHINE | [2004/33] | French: | TRICOT JACQUARD REALISE SUR UN METIER A MAILLES CUEILLIES | [2004/33] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2003 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/18] | 14.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3808843 (BLORE J, et al) [A] 1 * column 7, line 4 - line 29; figures 1-10; claim 1 *; | [A]US3937041 (BALCOMBE BOBBY L); | [A]US4356710 (MIZUNO TOSHIO, et al) | by applicant | US3808843 |