EP1453970 - DIAGNOSIS OF CLINICAL INFECTION OF A WOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Medical Ltd. Erskine House, 68-73 Queen Street Edinburgh EH2 4NH / GB | [2008/50] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Medical Ltd. Erskine House, 68-73 Queen Street Edinburgh EH2 4NH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CULLEN, Breda, Mary 7 Consort Street Skipton North Yorkshire BD23 1HR / GB | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/37] | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02774985.2 | 05.11.2002 | [2004/37] | WO2002GB05023 | Priority number, date | GB20010026534 | 05.11.2001 Original published format: GB 0126534 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03040406 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1453970 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1453970 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/37, G01N33/573 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
C12Q1/37 (EP,US);
G01N33/573 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N2333/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIAGNOSE VON EINER KLINISCHEN INFEKTION EINER WUNDE | [2004/37] | English: | DIAGNOSIS OF CLINICAL INFECTION OF A WOUND | [2004/37] | French: | DIAGNOSTIC D'UNE INFECTION CLINIQUE D'UNE PLAIE | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 27.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.12.2008 | BE | 10.12.2008 | CY | 10.12.2008 | DK | 10.12.2008 | EE | 10.12.2008 | FI | 10.12.2008 | SK | 10.12.2008 | TR | 10.12.2008 | BG | 10.03.2009 | SE | 10.03.2009 | GR | 11.03.2009 | PT | 11.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2010/48] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
GR | 11.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
DK | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
SK | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 10.12.2008 | |
BE | 10.12.2008 | ||
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
SE | 10.03.2009 | ||
PT | 11.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
EE | 10.12.2008 | ||
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
BG | 10.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 10.12.2008 | |
FI | 10.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 10.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0886140 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [Y]WO0008203 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 2 * * page 5, line 3 - line 30 *; | [X] - TARLTON J F ET AL, "Postsurgical wound progression monitored by temporal changes in the expression of matrix metalloproteinase-9.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF DERMATOLOGY, (1997), vol. 137, no. 4, ISSN 0007-0963, pages 506 - 516, XP009015255 [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * page 507, column 2, paragraph 6 - page 508, column 1, paragraph 6 * * page 510, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 511, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 511, column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 514, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2133.1997.tb03779.x | [Y] - HOFER H P ET AL, "Released PMN elastase: An indicator of postsurgical uneventful wound healing and early inflammatory complications. A contribution to the search for objective criteria in wound healing monitoring.", INJURY, (1995), vol. 26, no. 2, ISSN 0020-1383, pages 103 - 106, XP002250734 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0020-1383(95)92186-E | [Y] - BRATSCHITSCH G ET AL, "Clinical benefit of PMN-elastase as a determinant of inflammation signs for prospective wound healing monitoring after surgical emergency management", ACTA CHIRURGICA AUSTRIACA 1997 AUSTRIA, (1997), vol. 29, no. SUPPL. 133, ISSN 0001-544X, pages 29 - 31, XP009015252 [Y] 1-7 * the whole document * | [Y] - ADACHI Y ET AL, "Lipopolysaccharide increases fibronectin production and release from cultured lung fibroblasts partially through proteolytic activity.", JOURNAL OF LABORATORY AND CLINICAL MEDICINE, (1996), vol. 127, no. 5, ISSN 0022-2143, pages 448 - 455, XP009015383 [Y] 1,2,4-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2143(96)90062-1 | [A] - NWOMEH B C ET AL, "PHYSIOLOGY OF THE CHRONIC WOUND", CLINICS IN PLASTIC SURGERY, W.B.SAUNDERS CO., LONDON, GB, (199807), vol. 25, no. 3, ISSN 0094-1298, pages 341 - 356, XP008019702 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - YAGER ET L D R, "Ability of chronic wound fluids to degrade peptide growth factors is associated with increased levels of elastase activity and diminished levels of proteinase inhibitors", WOUND REPAIR AND REGENERATION, MOSBY-YEAR BOOK, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (1997), vol. 1, no. 5, ISSN 1067-1927, pages 23 - 32, XP002080317 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |