EP1432682 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF REPAGLINIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited 19, Nehru Place New Delhi 110 019 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | For all designated states RANBAXY LABORATORIES, LTD. 19, Nehru Place New Delhi 110 019 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAY, Purna Chandra 8076, Sector - D, Pocket - 8, Vasant Kunj 110 070 New Delhi, Delhi / IN | 02 /
BABU, Jayachandra Suresh C-237, Phase - I, Sushant Lok 122001 Gurgaon, Haryana / IN | 03 /
SALMAN, Mohammad P-2/19, Phase - II, DLF Qutab Enclave 122 001 Gurgaon, Haryana / IN | 04 /
KUMAR, Naresh House No. 1071, Sector 36C 160036 Chandigarh, Chandigarh / IN | [2004/27] | Representative(s) | Gilholm, Stephen Philip Ranbaxy Laboratories Limited Intellectual Property Department 20 Balderton Street London W1K 6TL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | Gilholm, Stephen Philip Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd, 95 Park Lane Mayfair, London W1K 7TE / GB | ||
Former [2004/46] | Gilholm, Stephen Philip Ranbaxy Europe Limited, 95 Park Lane London W1Y 3TA / GB | ||
Former [2004/27] | Cronin, Brian Harold John Cronin Intellectual Property Route de Clémenty 62 1260 Nyon / CH | Application number, filing date | 02775017.3 | 24.09.2002 | [2004/27] | WO2002IB03943 | Priority number, date | IN2001DEL0983 | 25.09.2001 Original published format: IN DE09832001 | [2004/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03027072 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1432682 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1432682 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D211/32, A61K31/445, A61P3/10 | [2004/27] | CPC: |
C07D295/135 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/27] | Extension states | AL | 26.04.2004 | LT | 26.04.2004 | LV | 26.04.2004 | MK | 26.04.2004 | RO | 26.04.2004 | SI | 26.04.2004 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON REPAGLINIDE | [2004/27] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF REPAGLINIDE | [2004/27] | French: | PROCESSUS DE PREPARATION DE REPAGLINIDE | [2004/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 12.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2005 | BE | 25.05.2005 | CH | 25.05.2005 | CZ | 25.05.2005 | EE | 25.05.2005 | FI | 25.05.2005 | LI | 25.05.2005 | NL | 25.05.2005 | SK | 25.05.2005 | TR | 25.05.2005 | BG | 25.08.2005 | DK | 25.08.2005 | GR | 25.08.2005 | CY | 24.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/11] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2005 | ||
EE | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
SK | 25.05.2005 | ||
TR | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
SK | 25.05.2005 | ||
TR | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
SK | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
NL | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
CH | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
LI | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
GR | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 25.05.2005 | |
BE | 25.05.2005 | ||
FI | 25.05.2005 | ||
BG | 25.08.2005 | ||
DK | 25.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 25.05.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS5965094 ; | [DA]US5312924 (GRELL WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * page 33 - page 34; example 11 *; | [A] - GRELL W ET AL, "REPAGLINIDE AND RELATED HYPOGLYCEMIC BENZOIC ACID DERIVATIVES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1998), vol. 41, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 5219 - 5246, XP000872800 [A] 1 * scheme 2. and scheme 3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9810349 | [A] - GUAY D R P, "REPAGLINIDE, A NOVEL, SHORT-ACTING HYPOGLYCEMIC AGENT FOR TYPE 2 DIABETES MELLITUS", PHARMACOTHERAPY, BOSTON, US, (1998), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0277-0008, pages 1195 - 1204, XP000874581 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840803), vol. 008, no. 168, Database accession no. (C - 236), & JP59065094 A 19840413 (SUMITOMO KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |