EP1439152 - GLASS PANEL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE GLASS PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8559 / JP | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF SYDNEY Parramatta Road Sydney, New South Wales 2006 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | ||
For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF SYDNEY Parramatta Road Sydney, New South Wales 2006 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMARI, Takeshi c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | 02 /
YOSHIZAWA, Hideo c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | 03 /
KATO, Hiroaki c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO., LTD. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8559 / JP | 04 /
COLLINS, Richard, Edward THE UNIVERSITY OF SYDNEY Parramatta Road Sydney, New South Wales 2006 / AU | 05 /
NG, Nelson c/o THE UNIVERSITY OF SYDNEY Parramatta Road Sydney, New South Wales 2006 / AU | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Bismarckstrasse 16 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2004/30] | Petersen, Frank, Dipl.-Ing., et al Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 11 08 47 76058 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 02775295.5 | 03.10.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002JP10344 | Priority number, date | JP20010327756 | 25.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001327756 | [2004/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03035566 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1439152 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C03C27/06 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
E06B3/6612 (EP,US);
C03C27/06 (EP,KR,US);
C03C27/10 (EP,US);
E06B3/6775 (EP,US);
Y02A30/249 (EP,US);
Y02B80/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Title | German: | GLASSCHEIBE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER GLASSCHEIBE | [2004/30] | English: | GLASS PANEL AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE GLASS PANEL | [2004/30] | French: | PANNEAU DE VERRE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2004 | Translation filed | 30.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 28.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   15.12.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9102878 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU]) [Y] 3 * page 8, line 11 - line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [YA]WO0112942 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU], et al) [Y] 4,6 * page 5, line 16 - page 8, line 11 * * page 9, line 33 - page 10, line 7 * * figure - * [A] 1,8,9; | [XY]CA2363272 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * page 14, line 1 - page 15, line 22 * * page 20, line 26 - page 21, line 11 * * figures 1,3,9 * [Y] 3,4,6; | [A]WO0175260 (GUARDIAN INDUSTRIES [US]) [A] 1,8,9* page 7, line 21 - page 9, line 33; figures 3-7 * | International search | [X]WO0147827 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]WO9315296 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU]); | [Y]WO9102878 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU]); | [A]JP2001064042 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) | by applicant | JPH0382046 |