EP1578908 - HUMAN SCHIZOPHRENIA GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Decode Genetics EHF. Sturlugötu 8 101 Reykjavik / IS | [2005/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEFANSSON, Hreinn Krokamvri 30 IS-210 Gardabaer / IS | 02 /
STEINTHORSDOTTIR, Valgerdur Silfurteigur 3 IS-105 Reykjavik / IS | 03 /
GULCHER, Jeffrey, R. 130 South Canal Street, 9M Chicago, IL 60606 / US | 04 /
GURNEY, Mark 910 Rosewood Avenue, SE East Grand Rapids, MI 49506 / US | 05 /
ANDRESSON, Thorkell Asgardur 75 IS-108 Reykjavik / IS | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Fridriksson, Einar Karl Arnason Faktor Intellectual Property Consulting Gudridarstig 2-4 113 Reykjavik / IS | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Fridriksson, Einar Karl A&P Arnason ehf., Intellectual Property Group, Efstaleiti 5 103 Reykjavik / IS | Application number, filing date | 02775752.5 | 05.09.2002 | [2005/39] | WO2002US28193 | Priority number, date | US20010946807 | 05.09.2001 Original published format: US 946807 | US20020107604 | 26.03.2002 Original published format: US 107604 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03020911 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1578908 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, C12Q1/68 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
C07K14/4756 (EP,US);
A01K67/0276 (EP,US);
A61K38/179 (EP,US);
A61P25/18 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0356 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
G01N2500/04 (EP,US);
G01N2800/2835 (EP,US);
G01N2800/302 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2005/39] | C12N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/39] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MENSCHLICHES SCHIZOPHRENIEGEN | [2005/39] | English: | HUMAN SCHIZOPHRENIA GENE | [2005/39] | French: | GENE HUMAIN DE LA SCHIZOPHRENIE | [2005/39] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2004 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 13.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/22] | 09.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9842362 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-28,33-42 * abstract *; | [X]WO9962955 (BIOMOLECULAR RESEARCH INST LIM [AU], et al) [X] 13-17 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO0164877 (DECODE GENETICS EHF [IS], et al) [PX] 1-28,33-42 * the whole document *; | [X] - JESCHKE M ET AL, "TARGETED INHIBITION OF TUMOR-CELL GROWTH BY RECOMBINANT HEREGULIN- TOXIN FUSION PROTEINS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19950303), vol. 60, no. 5, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 730 - 739, XP000571537 [X] 1,2,7,8,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.2910600527 | [X] - TANG C K ET AL, "ErbB - 4 ribozymes abolish neuregulin-induced mitogenesis", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19980801), vol. 58, no. 15, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 3415 - 3422, XP002108381 [X] 1,2,7-9,14,15 * abstract * | [X] - AZEMAR MARC ET AL, "Recombinant antibody toxins specific for ErbB2 and EGF receptor inhibit the in vitro growth of human head and neck cancer cells and cause rapid tumor regression in vivo", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (20000415), vol. 86, no. 2, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 269 - 275, XP002445533 [X] 1,2,5,8,14,15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(20000415)86:2<269::AID-IJC18>3.0.CO;2-8 | [A] - BUONANNO ANDRES ET AL, "Neuregulin and ErbB receptor signaling pathways in the nervous system.", CURRENT OPINION IN NEUROBIOLOGY, (200106), vol. 11, no. 3, ISSN 0959-4388, pages 287 - 296, XP002445534 [A] 1-28,33-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-4388(00)00210-5 | [T] - STEFANSSON H ET AL, "Neuregulin 1 and susceptibility to schizophrenia", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HUMAN GENETICS, CHICAGO, IL, US, (20020723), vol. 71, ISSN 0002-9297, pages 877 - 892, XP002984389 [T] 1-28,33-42 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/342734 | International search | [A] - TALMAGE D A ET AL, "Multiple personalities of neuregulin gene family members.", J COMP NEUROL., (2004), vol. 472, pages 134 - 139, XP009053195 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cne.20091 | [A] - HARRISON P J ET AL, "Schizophrenia genes, gene expression, and neuropathology: on the matter of their convergence.", MOL PSYCHIATRY., (2005), vol. 10, pages 40 - 68, XP009061024 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.mp.4001558 |