EP1436044 - AN ARRANGEMENT AND SYSTEM FOR ENABLING PATIENT CONTROL OF ELECTRICAL THERAPIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway LC340 Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UJHELYI, Michael, R. 9317 Tewsburg Gate North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | 02 /
MEHRA, Rahul 4980 Neal Avenue North Stillwater, MN 55082 / US | 03 /
SHETH, Nirav, V. 3347 132nd Circle Northwest Coon Rapids, MN 55448 / US | 04 /
POOL, Nancy, P. 1325 Montridge Court El Dorado Hills, CA 95762 / US | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/29] | 01 /
UJHELYI, Michael, R. 9317 Tewsburg Gate North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | ||
02 /
MEHRA, Rahul 4980 Neal Avenue North Stillwater, MN 55082 / US | |||
03 /
SHETH, Nirav, V. 3347 132nd Circle Northwest Coon Rapids, MN 55448 / US | |||
04 /
POOL, Nancy, P. 1150 Park Ridge Drive West Minnetonka, MN 55305 / US | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02776091.7 | 01.10.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US31394 | Priority number, date | US20010053035 | 19.10.2001 Original published format: US 53035 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03035171 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436044 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1436044 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/372 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
A61N1/3956 (EP,US);
A61N1/37258 (EP);
A61N1/37247 (EP);
A61N1/3987 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERMÖGLICHEN DER KONTROLLE EINER ELEKTROTHERAPIE DURCH DEN PATIENTEN | [2004/29] | English: | AN ARRANGEMENT AND SYSTEM FOR ENABLING PATIENT CONTROL OF ELECTRICAL THERAPIES | [2004/29] | French: | AGENCEMENT ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT LE CONTROLE PAR LE PATIENT DE THERAPIES ELECTRIQUES | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 06.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.05.2005 | CZ | 18.05.2005 | EE | 18.05.2005 | ES | 18.05.2005 | FI | 18.05.2005 | IT | 18.05.2005 | SK | 18.05.2005 | TR | 18.05.2005 | BG | 18.08.2005 | DK | 18.08.2005 | GR | 18.08.2005 | SE | 18.08.2005 | CY | 01.10.2005 | PT | 24.10.2005 | LU | 31.10.2005 | MC | 31.10.2005 | [2007/39] |
Former [2007/20] | BE | 18.05.2005 | |
CZ | 18.05.2005 | ||
EE | 18.05.2005 | ||
ES | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
SK | 18.05.2005 | ||
TR | 18.05.2005 | ||
BG | 18.08.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
CY | 01.10.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | BE | 18.05.2005 | |
CZ | 18.05.2005 | ||
EE | 18.05.2005 | ||
ES | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
SK | 18.05.2005 | ||
TR | 18.05.2005 | ||
BG | 18.08.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
LU | 31.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | BE | 18.05.2005 | |
CZ | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
SK | 18.05.2005 | ||
TR | 18.05.2005 | ||
BG | 18.08.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | BE | 18.05.2005 | |
CZ | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
SK | 18.05.2005 | ||
BG | 18.08.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
MC | 31.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | BE | 18.05.2005 | |
CZ | 18.05.2005 | ||
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
BG | 18.08.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | BE | 18.05.2005 | |
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
BG | 18.08.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
GR | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
PT | 24.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | BE | 18.05.2005 | |
FI | 18.05.2005 | ||
BG | 18.08.2005 | ||
DK | 18.08.2005 | ||
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 18.05.2005 | |
SE | 18.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 18.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4365633 (LOUGHMAN JAMES, et al) [A] 1-20* column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 53 *; | [A]US4488554 (NAPPHOLZ TIBOR A [AU], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 8 - column 3, line 29 *; | [A]US6021352 (CHRISTOPHERSON MARK A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 55 *; | [A]US6249703 (STANTON DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 6 - column 4, line 49 * | by applicant | US3311111 | US3805796 | US4223679 | US5843139 | US5987356 |