EP1436917 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING SHARED SUB-PACKETS IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ODENWALDER, Joseph, P. 18176 Lago Vista Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | 02 /
TIEDEMANN, Edward, G., Jr. 656 Barretts Mill Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Tao 5415 Harvest Run Drive San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 04 /
LUNDBY, Stein, A. 716 North Granados Avenue Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | 05 /
WEI, Yongbin c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated, 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 06 /
PUIG OSES, David QUALCOMM Incorporated, 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/29] | 01 /
ODENWALDER, Joseph, P. 18176 Lago Vista Rancho Santa Fe, CA 92067 / US | ||
02 /
TIEDEMANN, Edward, G., Jr. 656 Barretts Mill Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | |||
03 /
CHEN, Tao 5415 Harvest Run Drive San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
04 /
LUNDBY, Stein, A. 716 North Granados Avenue Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | |||
05 /
WEI, Yongbin 9920 Kika Court, 2027 San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
06 /
PUIG OSES, David 4435 Everts Street San Diego, CA 92109 / US | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/29] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02776179.0 | 08.10.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US32055 | Priority number, date | US20010981027 | 15.10.2001 Original published format: US 981027 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03034619 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436917 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04Q7/38 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
H04B7/2618 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/2637 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/18 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON GEMEINSAMEN TEILPAKETEN IN EINEM KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2004/29] | English: | METHOD FOR PROCESSING SHARED SUB-PACKETS IN A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2004/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE SOUS-PAQUETS PARTAGES DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 21.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/43] | 06.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/43] | Divisional application(s) | EP10009788.0 / EP2424130 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2006 | Request for further processing for: | 20.06.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.07.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY] - GHOSH A ET AL, "AIR-INTERFACE FOR 1XTREME/1XEV-DV", 53RD. VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, Rhodes, GR, (20010506), vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-6728-6, pages 2474 - 2478, XP001076204 [X] 1-3,6-15,18-23 * abstract * * page 2475, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * [Y] 4,5,16,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2001.944046 | [Y] - GHOSH A ET AL, "Performance of coded higher order modulation and hybrid ARQ for next generation cellular CDMA systems", 52ND VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, Boston, US, (20001024), vol. 2, pages 500 - 505, XP010525438 [Y] 4,5,16,17 * page 501, column R, paragraph L * | [XDY] - "1XTREME Physical Specification for Integrated Data and Voice Services in cdma2000 Spread Spectrum Systems", PROPOSAL TO 3GPP2, WG5 BY LSI LOGIC, TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, NOKIA AND MOTOROLA, Kauai, US, (20001208), no. C50-20011204-021, pages 4.1 - 4.72, XP002226831 [XD] 1-3,6-15,18-23 * pages 4-66, line 27 - pages 4-67, line 8 * * pages 4-13 * * pages 4-68, line 6 - line 34 * * pages 4-6 * [Y] 4,5,16,17 |