EP1436869 - TRANSMITTER PHOTONIC INTEGRATED CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infinera Corporation 1322 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2004/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kish, Jr. Fred A. 335 Everett Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
Joyner, Charles H. 374 Redondo Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 03 /
Webjorn, Jonas 730 Bair Island Rd Apt.302 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 04 /
Taylor, Robert B. 8 Ali Marie Court Windsor Mill, MD 21244 / US | 05 /
Nilsson, Alan C. 719 Shary Avenue Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 06 /
Welch, David F. 1845 White Oak Drive Menlo Park CA, 94025 / US | [2016/22] |
Former [2004/29] | 01 /
Kish, Jr. Fred A. 335 Everett Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | ||
02 /
Joyner, Charles H. 374 Redondo Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
03 /
Webjorn, Jonas 730 Bair Island Rd, Apt.302 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | |||
04 /
Taylor, Robert B. 8 Ali Marie Court Windsor Mill, MD 21244 / US | |||
05 /
Nilsson, Alan C. 719 Shary Avenue Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | |||
06 /
Welch, David F. 1845 White Oak Drive Menlo Park CA, 94025 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/22] |
Former [2004/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02776184.0 | 08.10.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US32112 | Priority number, date | US20010328207P | 09.10.2001 Original published format: US 328207 P | US20010328332P | 09.10.2001 Original published format: US 328332 P | US20020367595P | 25.03.2002 Original published format: US 367595 P | US20020370345P | 05.04.2002 Original published format: US 370345 P | US20020378010P | 10.05.2002 Original published format: US 378010 P | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03032547 | Date: | 17.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1436869 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1436869 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/291, H04B10/50, H04B10/572, H04J14/02, H01S5/34, B82Y20/00, G02F1/017, G02B6/02, G02B6/12, G02B6/124, H01S5/00, H01S5/024, H01S5/026, H01S5/042, H01S5/06, H01S5/0625, H01S5/0683, H01S5/0687, H01S5/12, H01S5/50, H01S5/22 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
G02B6/12033 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
G02B6/12004 (EP,US);
G02B6/12007 (EP,US);
G02B6/12019 (EP,US);
G02B6/12026 (EP,US);
G02B6/124 (EP,US);
H01S5/02415 (EP,US);
H01S5/0265 (EP,US);
H01S5/0612 (EP,US);
H01S5/12 (EP,US);
H01S5/22 (EP,US);
H01S5/4025 (EP,US);
H01S5/4031 (EP,US);
H04B10/2914 (EP,US);
H04B10/50 (EP,US);
H04B10/506 (EP,US);
H04B10/572 (EP,US);
H04J14/02 (EP,US);
G02B6/02204 (EP,US);
G02B6/12023 (EP,US);
G02B6/12028 (EP,US);
G02F1/01725 (EP,US);
G02F1/0175 (EP,US);
G02F1/01758 (EP,US);
H01S5/0085 (EP,US);
H01S5/024 (US);
H01S5/02453 (EP,US);
H01S5/02461 (EP,US);
H01S5/02476 (EP,US);
H01S5/026 (EP,US);
H01S5/0261 (EP,US);
H01S5/0264 (EP,US);
H01S5/0268 (EP,US);
H01S5/04256 (EP,US);
H01S5/06256 (EP,US);
H01S5/06258 (EP,US);
H01S5/0683 (EP,US);
H01S5/0687 (EP,US);
H01S5/1228 (EP,US);
H01S5/2077 (EP,US);
H01S5/2214 (EP,US);
H01S5/2224 (EP,US);
H01S5/227 (EP,US);
H01S5/2272 (EP,US);
H01S5/2275 (EP,US);
H01S5/3408 (EP,US);
H01S5/34306 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/48] | B82Y20/00, G02F1/017, G02B6/02, G02B6/12, G02B6/124, H01S5/00, H01S5/024, H01S5/042, H01S5/06, H01S5/0625, H01S5/0683, H01S5/0687, H01S5/227, H01S5/12, H01S5/22, H01S5/40, H01S5/343, H01S5/20, H01S5/50, H01S5/026 | ||
Former IPC [2004/29] | H01S5/026, H04B10/145 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2016/22] |
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE PHOTONISCHE TRANSMISSIONSMODULE | [2004/29] | English: | TRANSMITTER PHOTONIC INTEGRATED CIRCUIT | [2004/29] | French: | ARCHITECTURES ET SYSTEMES DE COMMANDE DE MICROCIRCUITS INTEGRES PHOTONIQUES D'EMISSION (TXPIC) ET STABILISATION DE LONGUEURS D'ONDES POUR TXPICS | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.06.2016 | NL | 01.06.2016 | [2017/09] |
Former [2016/52] | NL | 01.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5450431 (GLANCE BERNARD [US], et al) [A] 1-171 * the whole document *; | [X]US5870512 (KOCH THOMAS L [US], et al) [X] 1-171 * column 3, lines 21-35; figures 2,4 *; | [XA]WO0049689 (NEW FOCUS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,18,30,44,78,127,136,144,152 * abstract * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 25 * [A] 1-171; | [A]US2001005438 (MENEZO SYLVIE [FR]) [A] 44,64,70,71* the whole document *; | [A]US6271947 (IANNONE PATRICK P [US], et al) [A] 1-171 * the whole document *; | [XA] - SASAKI T ET AL, "SELECTIVE MOVPE GROWTH AND ITS APPLICATION TO SEMICONDUCTOR PHOTONIC INTEGRATED CIRCUITS", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART II - ELECTRONICS, SCRIPTA TECHNICA. NEW YORK, US, (19930401), vol. 76, no. 4, ISSN 8756-663X, pages 1 - 11, XP000420772 [X] 1,18,30,44,78,127,136,144,152,155 * the whole document * [A] 71,74,78,86,94,113 | [XA] - KUDO K ET AL, "1.55-MUM WAVELENGTH-SELECTABLE MICROARRAY DFB-LD'S WITH MONOLITHICALLY INTEGRATED MMI COMBINER, SOA, AND EA-MODULATOR", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200003), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 242 - 244, XP000931962 [X] 1,18,30,44,78,127,136,144,152 * the whole document * [A] 71,74,78,86,94,113 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.826901 | [A] - YOUNG M G ET AL, "A 16 X 1 WAVELENGTH DIVISION MULTIPLEXER WITH INTEGRATED DISTRIBUTED BRAGG REFLECTOR LASERS AND ELCTROABSORPTION MODULATORS", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19930801), vol. 5, no. 8, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 908 - 910, XP000399642 [A] 1-171 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/68.238250 |