EP1519842 - RUNNING WHEEL FOR SHOPPING AND TRANSPORT TROLLEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK GMBH Postfach 1129 D-89336 Leipheim / DE | [2005/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEYERLER, Kurt Dahlienweg 2 89257 Illertissen / DE | [2005/14] | Application number, filing date | 02776803.5 | 11.10.2002 | [2005/14] | WO2002DE03838 | Priority number, date | DE2002129931 | 04.07.2002 Original published format: DE 10229931 | [2005/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004005050 | Date: | 15.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1519842 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1519842 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60B33/00 | [2005/14] | CPC: |
B60B7/00 (EP,US);
B60B33/00 (KR);
B60B33/0028 (EP,US);
B60B33/0042 (EP,US);
B60B33/0049 (EP,US);
B60B33/0068 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/14] | Title | German: | LAUFROLLE FÜR EINKAUFS- UND TRANSPORTWAGEN | [2005/14] | English: | RUNNING WHEEL FOR SHOPPING AND TRANSPORT TROLLEY | [2005/14] | French: | GALET DE ROULEMENT POUR CHARIOTS DE SUPERMARCHE ET CHARIOTS DE TRANSPORT | [2005/14] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2005/14] | 02.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.03.2007 | CZ | 07.03.2007 | DK | 07.03.2007 | EE | 07.03.2007 | FI | 07.03.2007 | IE | 07.03.2007 | SK | 07.03.2007 | TR | 07.03.2007 | BG | 07.06.2007 | SE | 07.06.2007 | GR | 08.06.2007 | PT | 07.08.2007 | AT | 11.10.2007 | LU | 11.10.2007 | BE | 31.10.2007 | CH | 31.10.2007 | LI | 31.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 07.03.2007 | |
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
BG | 07.06.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
AT | 11.10.2007 | ||
LU | 11.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 07.03.2007 | |
CZ | 07.03.2007 | ||
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
AT | 11.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/15] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
AT | 11.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
EE | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
BE | 31.10.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
CH | 31.10.2007 | ||
LI | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
GR | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
DK | 07.03.2007 | ||
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 07.03.2007 | |
FI | 07.03.2007 | ||
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | FI | 07.03.2007 | |
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
SK | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 07.03.2007 | |
IE | 07.03.2007 | ||
SE | 07.06.2007 | ||
PT | 07.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 07.03.2007 | |
SE | 07.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2373405 (WANZL METALLWARENFABRIK KG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29518629U (RHOMBUS ROLLEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9617733 (FLEXELLO LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]DE29619734U (RHOMBUS ROLLEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * |