EP1438749 - ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2008/13] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Osram Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnitzstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states Osram Opto Semiconductors GmbH Wernerwerkstrasse 2 93049 Regensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRNSTOCK, Jan Bayreuther Strasse 21 01187 Dresden / DE | 02 /
BLÄSSING, Jörg Kopernikusstrasse 97 73447 Oberkochen / DE | 03 /
HEUSER, Karsten Eifelweg 3 91056 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
STÖSSEL, Matthias Paul-Martin-Ufer 52 68163 Mannheim / DE | 05 /
WITTMANN, Georg Erlenstrasse 10 A 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/30] | 01 /
BIRNSTOCK, Jan Johannisplatz 3/440 04103 Leipzig / DE | ||
02 /
BLÄSSING, Jörg Kopernikusstrasse 97 73447 Oberkochen / DE | |||
03 /
HEUSER, Karsten Eifelweg 3 91056 Erlangen / DE | |||
04 /
STÖSSEL, Matthias Paul-Martin-Ufer 52 68163 Mannheim / DE | |||
05 /
WITTMANN, Georg Erlenstrasse 10 A 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02776807.6 | 11.10.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002DE03843 | Priority number, date | DE2001152919 | 26.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10152919 | [2004/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03038898 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1438749 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1438749 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/32 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
H10K59/122 (EP,US);
H10K59/173 (EP,US);
H10K59/221 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/30] | H01L27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE [2010/31] |
Former [2004/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | ORGANISCHES ELEKTROLUMINESZIERENDES DISPLAY | [2004/30] | English: | ORGANIC ELECTROLUMINESCENT DISPLAY | [2004/30] | French: | SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE ELECTROLUMINESCENT ORGANIQUE | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 06.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0767599 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,13,15,16,31* column 5, line 35 - column 11, line 6; figures 1-13 *; | [X]WO9859356 (FED CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,13,15,31 * page 6, line 5 - page 8, line L; figures 1-3 * * page 9, line 14 - page 10, line 22 *; | [X]EP0938248 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,3-13,15,24,31 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023]; figure 2A * * paragraph [0026]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0030]; figure 4B * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035]; figures 5A-5C *; | [X]GB2348050 (FUJI ELECTRIC IMAGING DEVICE [JP]) [X] 1,2,13-16,24,27,31 * page 4, line 1 - line 17; figure 2C * * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 8 *; | [X]WO0141229 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3-7,10-15,24-26,28,29,31 * page 16, line 1 - line 29; figure 1 * * page 22, line 21 - page 23, line 31; figure 4 * | Examination | EP0996314 | EP1122793 | US2001015626 | US2001026124 |