EP1427815 - METHODS FOR THE INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTION OF VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/25] | METHODS FOR PRODUCING AN ACTIVE CONSTITUENT OF A PHARMACEUTICAL OR A DIAGNOSTIC AGENT IN AN MDCK CELL SUSPENSION CULTURE | ||
[2010/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2010/10] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics GmbH & Co. KG Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states Chiron Behring GmbH & Co. Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VORLOP, Jürgen Zum Pfaffengrund 1c 35041 Marburg / DE | 02 /
Frech, Christian Sonnenweg 1c 35041 Marburg / DE | 03 /
LÜBBEN, Holger An der Koppe 18 35083 Wetter / DE | 04 /
GREGERSEN, Jens-Peter Gebr.-Plitt-Str. 25 35083 Wetter / DE | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02777069.2 | 11.09.2002 | [2004/25] | WO2002EP10208 | Priority number, date | DE2001144906 | 12.09.2001 Original published format: DE 10144906 | [2004/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03023021 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1427815 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1427815 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/07, C12N7/00, A61K39/12, A61P31/12 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P31/22 (EP);
A61K2039/5252 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2710/10051 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16651 (EP,US);
C12N2710/16751 (EP,US);
C12N2710/24151 (EP,US);
C12N2720/12051 (EP,US);
C12N2720/12351 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16251 (EP,US);
C12N2760/18051 (EP,US);
C12N2760/18551 (EP,US);
C12N2760/20151 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24151 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/25] | C12N5/06, C12N7/00, A61K39/12, A61P31/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/25] | Extension states | AL | 07.04.2004 | LT | 07.04.2004 | LV | 07.04.2004 | MK | 07.04.2004 | RO | 07.04.2004 | SI | 07.04.2004 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GROSSTECHNISCHEN HERSTELLUNG VON IMPFSTOFFEN | [2010/15] | English: | METHODS FOR THE INDUSTRIAL PRODUCTION OF VACCINES | [2010/15] | French: | PROCEDES POUR LA PRODUCTION INDUSTRIELLE DE VACCINS | [2010/15] |
Former [2004/25] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AKTIVEN BESTANDTEILS EINES ARZNEI- ODER DIAGNOSEMITTELS IN MDCK-ZELL-SUSPENSIONSKULTUR | ||
Former [2004/25] | METHODS FOR PRODUCING AN ACTIVE CONSTITUENT OF A PHARMACEUTICAL OR A DIAGNOSTIC AGENT IN AN MDCK CELL SUSPENSION CULTURE | ||
Former [2004/25] | PROCEDES POUR REALISER UN COMPOSANT ACTIF POUR MEDICAMENT OU AGENT DE DIAGNOSTIC DANS UNE CULTURE EN SUSPENSION DE CELLULES MDCK | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 03.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08018057.3 / EP2011862 | EP10004227.4 / EP2216400 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9737001 (CHIRON BEHRING GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9737000 (CHIRON BEHRING GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [DA] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A] - ROESSLER BURKHARD ET AL, "Temperature: A simple parameter for process optimization in fed-batch cultures of recombinant Chinese hamster ovary cells.", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0141-0229, pages 423 - 427, XP002238255 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0141-0229(95)00121-2 | [A] - MERTEN O-W ET AL, "PRODUCTION OF INFLUENZA VIRUS IN CELL CULTURES FOR VACCINE PREPARATION", ADVANCES IN EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, SPRING ST., NY, US, (1996), vol. 397, ISSN 0065-2598, pages 141 - 151, XP002039317 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9615231 | - WARD ET AL., J.CLIN.MICROBIOL., (1984), pages 748 - 753 | - PROVOST; HILLEMANN, PROC. SOC. EXP. BIO. MED., (1979), vol. 160, pages 213 - 221 | - GREGERSEN A.A.0; MAHY A.A.O.; REIMER C. ET AL., JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (196712), pages 1207 - 1216 | - NAVARRO DEL CANIZO, A. ET AL., APPLIED BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 61, page 399 | - PRIOR, C. ET AL., BIOPHARM, (199610), page 22 | - Methods in Enzymology, (1990), vol. 182 |