EP1438649 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ENABLING KEYBOARD ACCELERATORS IN APPLICATIONS IMPLEMENTED VIA A BROWSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siebel Systems, Inc. 2207 Bridgepoint Parkway San Mateo, CA 94404 / US | [2004/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATCHOUR, Ernst 13673 Old Tree Way Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 02 /
NATHAN, Shankar, S. 5569 Wailaau Road Koloa, HI 96756 / US | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William Harrison Goddard Foote 40- 43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Molyneaux, Martyn William Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2004/30] | Dixon, Philip Matthew Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02778392.7 | 27.09.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002US30888 | Priority number, date | US20010967467 | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 967467 | [2004/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03029947 | Date: | 10.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1438649 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2005/33] | CPC: |
G06F9/45512 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/30] | G06F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG VON TASTATURBESCHLEUNIGERN IN ÜBER EINEN BROWSER IMPLEMENTIERTEN ANWENDUNGEN | [2004/30] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR ENABLING KEYBOARD ACCELERATORS IN APPLICATIONS IMPLEMENTED VIA A BROWSER | [2004/30] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR ACTIONNER DES ACCELERATEURS DE CLAVIER DANS DES APPLICATIONS MISES EN OEUVRE PAR UN NAVIGATEUR | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/09] | 07.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5801701 (KOPPOLU SRINIVASA R [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * column 39, line 58 - column 42, line 5 * * column A * * column 7, lines 38-63 *; | [X] - INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION, "Browser hot keys based on web location", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, KENNETH MASON PUBLICATIONS, WESTBOURNE, GB, (200106), vol. 446, no. 151, ISSN 0374-4353, XP007128457 [X] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - ENGLAND C, "Capturing Function Keys from Browser", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20000118), microsoft.public.windows.inetexplorer.ie5.browser, URL: http://groups-beta.google.com/group/microsoft.public.windows.inetexplorer.ie5.browser/msg/3811d36f0139faa5?hl=en, (20050623), XP002333358 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5790117 (HALVIATTI RAMIN L [US], et al); | [Y]US5916310 (MCCAIN WILLIAM C [US]); | [A]US5973688 (MAY GREGORY J [US]); | [A]US6114978 (HOAG LAVERNE L [US]); | [A]US6115040 (BLADOW CHAD R [US], et al) |