EP1450885 - NASAL NEBULIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kurve Technology, Inc. 723 191st Street SW Lynnwood, WA 98036 / US | [2004/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIROUX, Marc 723 191st Street SW Lynnwood, WA 98036 / US | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2014/44] |
Former [2004/36] | Wittop Koning, Tom Hugo Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 02778422.2 | 30.09.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US31450 | Priority number, date | US20010325971P | 28.09.2001 Original published format: US 325971 P | US20020379428P | 09.05.2002 Original published format: US 379428 P | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03026559 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1450885 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1450885 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/08, A61M11/00, A61M15/00, A61M16/06 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
A61M11/00 (EP,US);
A61M11/001 (EP,US);
A61M15/0008 (EP,US);
A61M15/0028 (EP,US);
A61M15/0086 (EP,US);
A61M15/08 (US);
|
Former IPC [2004/45] | A61M11/00, A61M15/00, A61M16/00, A61M16/18, A61M16/06, A61M16/10 | ||
Former IPC [2004/36] | A61M11/00, A61M15/00, A61M16/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | NASALER VERNEBLER | [2004/36] | English: | NASAL NEBULIZER | [2004/36] | French: | NEBULISEUR NASAL | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 13.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2005 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 15.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2005 | 30.09.2009 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2010 | 30.09.2011 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2012 | 30.09.2014 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   16.03.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.04.2015 | BE | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | ES | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | IT | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | SE | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | GB | 30.09.2015 | IE | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | LU | 30.09.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/36] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB1069048 (DEVILBISS CO) [X] 8-10 * page 3, lines 54-68 * * page 4, lines 52-112; figure - * [A] 30; | [A]US3362405 (HAZEL HAMILTON O) [A] 8,30* the whole document *; | [A]US4299784 (HENSE GUENTER) [A] 8 * abstract *; | [Y]US4454880 (MUTO RUDOLPH [US], et al) [Y] 10-13,15 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0539674 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [Y] 8-21 * page 6, line 56 - page 8, line 14 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5309900 (KNOCH MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 8,30-43 * column 3, lines 50-66; figure - *; | [A]US5458135 (PATTON JOHN S [US], et al) [A] 8,30-41,43 * column 6, line 59 - column 10, line 67; figure - *; | [A]EP0734719 (GSF FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM UMWELT [DE]) [A] 8,9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0747078 (RESPIRONICS INC [US]) [Y] 14,16-21 * column 3, line 36 - column 7, line 57; figure - *; | [XA]WO9826827 (INNOVATA BIOMED LTD [GB], et al) [X] 30,32,39,41,43 * page 7, line 19 - page 15, line 7; figure - * [A] 8; | [A]US5950623 (MICHELL BRIAN C [US]) [A] 8-10 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO9947273 (LYTESYDE L L C [US]) [X] 30,32,33,39,43 * page 6, line 19 - page 27, line 31; figures 1-22 * [A] 8; | [XA]WO0136033 (SYSTEMIC PULMONARY DELIVERY LT [US]) [X] 30,32,33,39,43 * page 9, line 3 - page 14, line 3; figure - * [A] 8; | [YA]WO0149350 (CHIESI FARMA SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 8,9 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 1; figure 1 * [A] 30 | International search | [A]US5855202 (ANDRADE JOSEPH R [US]); | [A]US6240917 (ANDRADE JOSEPH R [US]); | [A]US6202643 (SLADEK DAVID T [US]); | [X]US4809692 (NOWACKI CHRISTOPHER [US], et al); | [X]US5435282 (HABER TERRY M [US], et al); | [A]US5203323 (TRITLE PAUL E [US]); | [A]US5785049 (SMITH ADRIAN E [US], et al); | [A]US5485828 (HAUSER JEAN-LUC [FR]); | [Y]US6112746 (KWOK PHILIP RODNEY [AU], et al); | [Y]US4461425 (MILLER KENNETH G [US]); | [Y]US5755218 (JOHANSSON ERIC T [US], et al); | [Y]US5577497 (MECIKALSKI MARK B [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0103603 | WO9947273 | WO9826827 |