EP1451694 - NATIONAL IDENTIFICATION CARD SYSTEM AND BIOMETRIC IDENTITY VERIFICATION METHOD FOR NEGOTIATING TRANSACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haala, Catherine A. 905 Rockrimmon Road Stamford, CT 06903 / US | [2004/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Lloyd, Patrick Alexander Desmond Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02778431.3 | 04.11.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002US31614 | Priority number, date | US20010985734 | 06.11.2001 Original published format: US 985734 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03040931 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1451694 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/14, H04L9/32, G07F7/10, G07C9/00 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G07C9/257 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4014 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40145 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4016 (EP,US);
G07F7/08 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/36] | G06F12/14, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NATIONALES IDENTIFIKATIONSKARTENSYSTEM UND BIOMETRISCHES IDENTITÄTSVERIFIKATIONSVERFAHREN ZUM AUSHANDELN VON TRANSAKTIONEN | [2004/36] | English: | NATIONAL IDENTIFICATION CARD SYSTEM AND BIOMETRIC IDENTITY VERIFICATION METHOD FOR NEGOTIATING TRANSACTIONS | [2004/36] | French: | SYSTEME DE CARTE D'IDENTITE NATIONALE ET PROCEDE BIOMETRIQUE DE VERIFICATION D'IDENTITE DANS DES NEGOCIATIONS TRANSACTIONNELLES | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 01.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/50] | 24.07.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US4993068 (PIOSENKA GERALD V [US], et al) [DX] 1-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 17 - column 3, line 12 *; | [X]US5513272 (BOGOSIAN JR CHARLES A [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 2, line 17 - line 63 *; | [X]US5869822 (MEADOWS II DEXTER L [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 22 * * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 56 ** figure 2 *; | [X]GB2331825 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 11 * * page 6, line 31 - page 8, line 32 *; | [X]EP0924655 (TRW INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0013] *; | [DX]US6208264 (BRADNEY MONTY T [US], et al) [DX] 1-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 64 * * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 5 * * column 6, line 5 - line 17 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 15 * * column 9, line 10 - line 46 *; | [X]EP1139301 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0016] - [0018] - [0020] , [0024] , [0031] , [0033] , [0034] , [0078] - [0087] * | International search | [Y]US5457747 (DREXLER JEROME [US], et al); | [YP]US2001045458 (POLANSKY STEPHEN T [CA]); | [AP]US6386451 (SEHR RICHARD P [US]); | [YP]US2002129257 (PARMELEE CHRISTOPHER L [US], et al); | [Y] - "Pilot smartcard to roll out next year", PROQUEST, XP002958507 | [Y] - HENDRY MIKE, "Smart card security and applications", ARTECH HOUSE, INC., (1997), pages 136 - 139, XP002958508 |