EP1448672 - HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLY(IMIDE)S AND METHODS OF SYNTHESIS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2012/52] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Sabic Innovative Plastics IP B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | ||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYES, Robert, Frederick 6 Burton Drive Ballston Lake New York 12019 / US | [2012/52] |
Former [2004/48] | 01 /
HAYES, Robert, Frederick 6 Burton Drive Ballston Lake New York 12019 / US | ||
Former [2004/38] | 01 /
HAYES, Robert, Frederick 8940 Winery Road Wadesville IN 47638 / US | ||
Former [2004/35] | 01 /
HAYES, Robert, Frederick 6 Burton Drive Malta, NY 12020 / US | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2012/52] |
Former [2009/27] | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [2007/40] | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | ||
Former [2004/35] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02778435.4 | 04.10.2002 | [2004/35] | WO2002US31653 | Priority number, date | US20010682960 | 02.11.2001 Original published format: US 682960 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03040213 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1448672 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1448672 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
C08G73/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08G73/1057 (KR);
C08G73/1064 (KR);
C08G73/1085 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/35] | Title | German: | HOCHMOLEKULARE POLYIMIDE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2004/35] | English: | HIGH MOLECULAR WEIGHT POLY(IMIDE)S AND METHODS OF SYNTHESIS THEREOF | [2004/35] | French: | POLY(IMIDE)S A POIDS MOLECULAIRE ELEVE ET PROCEDE DE SYNTHESE | [2004/35] | Entry into regional phase | 02.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.05.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.12.2012 | BE | 26.12.2012 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | DK | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | IT | 26.12.2012 | MC | 26.12.2012 | NL | 26.12.2012 | SE | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | BG | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/25] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
MC | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
IT | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
DK | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
NL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 26.12.2012 | |
BE | 26.12.2012 | ||
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
CY | 26.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 26.12.2012 | |
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 26.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US3905942 (TAKEKOSHI TOHRU, et al) [AD] 1-22* claims 1-13 *; | [A]US4197397 (ALELIO GAETANO F D [US]) [A] 1-22 * claims 1-17 * | Examination | US4405770 | by applicant | US4405770 |