EP1436961 - METHOD AND SYSTEM TO CAPTURE DATA AND AUTHENTICATION OF THE CAPTURED DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company P.O. Box 272400 Fort Collins CO 80527-2400 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2004/29] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company IP Administration, P.O. Box 272400, M/S 3 Fort Collins, Colorado 80527-2400 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAPMAN, Charles, B. 1055 Calle de Lepanto Escondido, CA 92025 / US | 02 /
CHILDERS, Winthrop, D. 9855 Fox Valley Way San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 03 /
POTTS, Jerry, R. 3248 Via Ribera Escondido, CA 92029 / US | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Jackson, Richard Eric, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02778605.2 | 17.10.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US33253 | Priority number, date | US20010981779 | 17.10.2001 Original published format: US 981779 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03034680 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1436961 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/00 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/12 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N1/2112 (EP,US);
H04N1/32101 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0084 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3205 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3207 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3215 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHOD UND SYSTEM ZUR SICHEREN AUFBEWAHRUNG VON DATEN UND AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG DERSELBEN | [2004/29] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM TO CAPTURE DATA AND AUTHENTICATION OF THE CAPTURED DATA | [2004/29] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE CHAINE DE GARDE | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/42] | 01.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US5499294 (FRIEDMAN GARY L [US]) [XD] 1-14 * column 1, line 31 - column 5, line 44 *; | [XD]US5751809 (DAVIS DEREK L [US], et al) [XD] 1-14 * column A * * column 1, line 18 - column 4, line 67 *; | [XD]US5764770 (SCHIPPER JOHN F [US], et al) [XD] 1-14 * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 56 * * column 4, line 17 - line 29 * * column 6, line 14 - column 9, line 51 *; | [A]WO0076171 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1,6,10-12 * page 4, line 16 - page 7, line 26 * * page 13, line 28 - page 22, line 3 *; | [XD]US6163361 (MCINTYRE DALE F [US], et al) [XD] 1-14 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 53 * * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 20 *; | [XP]WO0237375 (REALTOOLBOX [GB], et al) [XP] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1, line 8 - page 5, line 5 * * page 16, line 25 - page 37, line 19 ** figures 5,6,9-11,14 * |