EP1399558 - VANILLOID RECEPTOR-RELATED NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | For all designated states IRM LLC PO Box HM 2899 Hamilton HM LX / BM | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For all designated states IRM LLC PO Box HM 2899 Hamilton HM LX / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATAPOUTIAN, Ardem 4330 North Talmadge Drive San Diego, CA 92116 / US | 02 /
SONG, Chuanzheng 87 Reinman Road Warren, NJ 07059 / US | 03 /
GANJU, Pamposh, Novartis Inst. for Medical Sci. Unniv. College, 5 Gower Place London WC1E 6BN / GB | 04 /
PEIER, Andrea 9725 Mesa Springs Way 176 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 05 /
MCINTYRE, Peter, Novartis Inst. for Medical Sci. University College, 5 Gower Place London WC1E 6BN / GB | 06 /
BEVAN, Stuart, Novartis Institute for Medical Sci. University College, 5 Gower Place London WC1E 6BN / GB | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2005/12] | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2004/13] | Grubb, Philip William Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 02778891.8 | 13.06.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002EP06520 | Priority number, date | US20010297835P | 13.06.2001 Original published format: US 297835 P | US20020351238P | 22.01.2002 Original published format: US 351238 P | US20020352914P | 29.01.2002 Original published format: US 352914 P | US20020357161P | 12.02.2002 Original published format: US 357161 P | US20020381086P | 15.05.2002 Original published format: US 381086 P | US20020381739P | 16.05.2002 Original published format: US 381739 P | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02101045 | Date: | 19.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1399558 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/705, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, C07K16/18, G01N33/50, G01N33/53 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61P25/04 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
G01N33/6872 (EP,US);
G01N33/6896 (EP,US);
G01N2500/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VANILLOID-REZEPTOR VERWANDTE NUKLEINSÄUREN UND POLYPEPTIDE | [2004/13] | English: | VANILLOID RECEPTOR-RELATED NUCLEIC ACIDS AND POLYPEPTIDES | [2004/13] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES ET ACIDES NUCLEIQUES APPARENTES AUX RECEPTEURS VANILLOIDES | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.03.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 16.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/51] | 28.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/51] | Request for further processing for: | 16.01.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6194152 (LAUS REINER [US], et al) [X] 97-129,134-168 * See sequences 14 and 15 *; | [X] - CATERINA M J ET AL, "THE CAPSAICIN RECEPTOR: A HEAT-ACTIVATED ION CHANNEL IN THE PAIN PATHWAY", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, vol. 389, ISSN 0028-0836, (19971023), Database accession no. NP_542437, pages 816 - 824, URL: EMBL, XP002075020 [X] 1,2,12,13,15-17,19-21 * the whole document * * See especially Figure 5a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/39807 | [ ] - "Rattus norvegicus vanilloid receptor subtype 1 mRNA, complete cds", EMBL, (19971030), Database accession no. AF029310, URL: EMBL, XP002239516 [ ] * the whole document * | [T] - PEIER ANDREA M ET AL, "A heat-sensitive TRP channel expressed in keratinocytes.", SCIENCE (WASHINGTON D C), 14 June, 2002, vol. 296, no. 5575, ISSN 0036-8075, (2002), Database accession no. NM_145099, pages 2046 - 2049, URL: EMBL, XP002239399 [T] 1-50,145-168 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1073140 | [T] - "Homo sapiens transient receptor potential cation channel, subfamily V, member 3 (TRPV3), mRNA", EMBL, (20030406), Database accession no. NM_145068, URL: EMBL, XP002239517 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - "Mus musculus transient receptor potential cation channel, subfamily V, member 3 (Trpv3), mRNA", EMBL, (20030406), Database accession no. NM_145099, URL: EMBL, XP002239518 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - XU HAOXING ET AL, "TRPV3 is a calcium-permeable temperature-sensitive cation channel.", NATURE (LONDON), 11 July, 2002, (2002), vol. 418, no. 6894, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 181 - 186, XP002239400 [T] 1-50,145-168 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature00882 | [T] - SMITH G D ET AL, "TRPV3 is a temperature-sensitive vanilloid receptor-like protein.", NATURE (LONDON), 11 July, 2002, (2002), vol. 418, no. 6894, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 186 - 190, XP002239401 [T] 1-50,145-168 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature00894 | [X] - TSAVALER LARISA ET AL, "Trp-p8, a novel prostate-specific gene, is up-regulated in prostate cancer and other malignancies and shares high homology with transient receptor potential calcium channel proteins.", CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 61, no. 9, ISSN 0008-5472, (20010501), Database accession no. AY090109, pages 3760 - 3769, URL: EMBL, XP002246273 [X] 97-129,134-168 * the whole document * * See especially Page 3763, Fig. 1 * | [T] - TSAVALER, L. ET AL., "Homo sapiens transient receptor potential cation channel protein (TRPM8) mRNA, complete cds", EMBL, (20020413), Database accession no. AY090109, URL: EMBL, XP002246300 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - PEIER ANDREA M ET AL, "A TRP channel that senses cold stimuli and menthol.", CELL, March 8, 2002, vol. 108, no. 5, ISSN 0092-8674, (20020308), Database accession no. AF481480, pages 705 - 715, URL: EMBL, XP002246274 [T] 97-129,134-168 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(02)00652-9 | [T] - PATAPOUTIAN, A. AND PEIER, A.M., "Mus musculus TRP ion channel TRPM8 (Trpm8) mRNA, complete cds", EMBL, (20020515), Database accession no. AF481480, URL: EMBL, XP002246301 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - FUESSEL SUSANNE ET AL, "Multiple tumor marker analyses (PSA, hK2, PSCA, trp-p8) in primary prostate cancers using quantitative RT-PCR.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ONCOLOGY. GREECE JUL 2003, (200307), vol. 23, no. 1, ISSN 1019-6439, pages 221 - 228, XP009013243 [T] 97-129,134-168 | [A] - CLAPHAM D E ET AL, "The TRP ion channel family.", NATURE REVIEWS. NEUROSCIENCE. ENGLAND JUN 2001, (20010601), vol. 2, no. 6, ISSN 1471-003X, pages 387 - 396, XP001135189 [A] * page 391; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35077544 | [T] - MONTELL CRAIG ET AL, "A unified nomenclature for the superfamily of TRP cation channels.", MOLECULAR CELL, February, 2002, (200202), vol. 9, no. 2, ISSN 1097-2765, pages 229 - 231, XP002239402 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1097-2765(02)00448-3 | [T] - PENG JI-BIN ET AL, "Structural conservation of the genes encoding CaT1, CaT2, and related cation channels.", GENOMICS, (200108), vol. 76, no. 1-3, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 99 - 109, XP002239515 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.2001.6606 | Examination | WO0200722 |