EP1441920 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN AIR CONDITIONING UNIT FOR AN AUTOMOBILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Preh GmbH An der Stadthalle 97616 Bad Neustadt a.d. Saale / DE | [2004/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTBROD, Thomas Rederstrasse 15 97616 Bad Neustadt / DE | 02 /
NÖTH, Thomas Brahmstrasse 5 97616 Bad Neustadt / DE | [2004/32] | Representative(s) | Thul, Hermann Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Thul, Hermann Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2004/32] | Thul, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys. Zentrale Patentabteilung, Rheinmetall AG, Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02779494.0 | 17.10.2002 | [2004/32] | WO2002EP11598 | Priority number, date | DE2001155410 | 10.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10155410 | [2004/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03041976 | Date: | 22.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1441920 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441920 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
B60H1/0075 (EP,US);
B60H1/00 (KR);
B60H1/00771 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER KLIMAANLAGE FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2004/32] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING AN AIR CONDITIONING UNIT FOR AN AUTOMOBILE | [2004/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UNE CLIMATISATION AUTOMOBILE | [2004/32] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.01.2007 | CZ | 03.01.2007 | DK | 03.01.2007 | EE | 03.01.2007 | FI | 03.01.2007 | FR | 03.01.2007 | GB | 03.01.2007 | IE | 03.01.2007 | IT | 03.01.2007 | NL | 03.01.2007 | SK | 03.01.2007 | TR | 03.01.2007 | SE | 03.04.2007 | BG | 04.04.2007 | GR | 04.04.2007 | ES | 14.04.2007 | PT | 04.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/34] | CY | 03.01.2007 | |
CZ | 03.01.2007 | ||
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
FR | 03.01.2007 | ||
GB | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
IT | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
EE | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
FR | 03.01.2007 | ||
GB | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
IT | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
FR | 03.01.2007 | ||
GB | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
IT | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
GB | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
IT | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
FR | 24.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | CZ | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
GB | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
GB | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SK | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
IE | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
FI | 03.01.2007 | ||
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 03.01.2007 | |
NL | 03.01.2007 | ||
SE | 03.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.04.2007 | ||
ES | 14.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS59100010 ; | [X]US5553661 (BEYERLEIN DAVID G [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * column W *; | [AD]DE19829143 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841003), vol. 008, no. 216, Database accession no. (M - 329), & JP59100010 A 19840609 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4041770 | DE4024431 | DE19748826 | DE19744414 | DE19829143 | DE19802594 | DE19902201 | DE19953511 |