EP1446381 - ANTHRANILIC ACID AMIDES AND PHARMACEUTICAL USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, SK | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | [2010/45] |
Former [2010/31] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
SK
TR
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2009/43] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2004/34] | For:BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLD, Guido Bleumatthöhe 16 CH-5073 Gipf-Oberfrick / CH | 02 /
FURET, Pascal 24, rue du Riegelsbourg F-68800 Thann / FR | 03 /
MANLEY, Paul, William Bruggweg 12 CH-4144 Arlesheim / CH | [2004/34] | Representative(s) | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/12] | de Weerd, Petrus G.W., et al Novartis International AG Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2004/34] | Grubb, Philip William Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 02779536.8 | 07.11.2002 | [2004/34] | WO2002EP12445 | Priority number, date | GB20010026901 | 08.11.2001 Original published format: GB 0126901 | GB20020012917 | 05.06.2002 Original published format: GB 0212917 | [2004/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03040101 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1446381 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1446381 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/38, C07D213/89, C07C237/40, A61K31/44, A61K31/165, A61P35/00 | [2004/34] | CPC: |
C07C237/40 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/38 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/44 (KR);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/34] | Extension states | AL | 08.06.2004 | LT | 08.06.2004 | LV | 08.06.2004 | MK | 08.06.2004 | RO | 08.06.2004 | SI | 08.06.2004 | Title | German: | ANTHRANILSÄUREAMIDE UND IHRE PHARMAZEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG | [2004/34] | English: | ANTHRANILIC ACID AMIDES AND PHARMACEUTICAL USE THEREOF | [2004/34] | French: | AMIDES D'ACIDE ANTHRANILIQUE ET UTILISATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES | [2004/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10180423.5 / EP2269988 | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 23.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.01.2011 | CZ | 05.01.2011 | DK | 05.01.2011 | EE | 05.01.2011 | FI | 05.01.2011 | SE | 05.01.2011 | SK | 05.01.2011 | BG | 05.04.2011 | [2011/51] |
Former [2011/47] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO0027820 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [XD] 1,9,10,12,13* claims 1-17; table 1 * |