EP1415215 - METHOD FOR MAKING DATABASES SECURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PUCHERAL, Philippe 88, rue Sacco et Vanzetti F-94460 Valenton / FR | 02 /
BOUGANIM, Luc 29, rue Boussingault F-75013 Paris / FR | [2004/19] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/37] | Breese, Pierre NOVAGRAAF IP 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/19] | Breese, Pierre 3, avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02779619.2 | 07.08.2002 | [2004/19] | WO2002FR02824 | Priority number, date | FR20010010552 | 07.08.2001 Original published format: FR 0110552 | [2004/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03014888 | Date: | 20.02.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1415215 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.02.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00, G06F17/30 | [2004/19] | CPC: |
G06F21/606 (EP,US);
G06F16/2455 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2107 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SICHERUNG VON DATENBANKEN | [2004/19] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING DATABASES SECURE | [2004/19] | French: | PROCEDE DE SECURISATION DE BASES DE DONNEES | [2004/19] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 18.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/41] | 31.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5559888 (JAIN AJAY [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 58 - line 67 *; | [A]EP0766184 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 16* abstract *; | [A]US5721777 (BLAZE MATTHEW A [US]) [A] 5 * column 2, line 10 - line 35 *; | [Y]US5963642 (GOLDSTEIN BENJAMIN D [US]) [Y] 1,2,7-9,12,15 * column 11, line 58 - column 12, line 36 * * column 13, line 27 - line 61 * * column 14, line 38 - column 15, line 31 * * column 26, line 43 - line 56 * * figure 5 *; | [Y]US2001007975 (NYBERG JAMES RONALD [US], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 16 - page 3, paragraph 28 * * page 3, paragraph 35 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y] - DOMINGO-FERRER J, "Multi-application smart cards and encrypted data, processing", FUTURE GENERATIONS COMPUTER SYSTEMS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19970701), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 0167-739X, pages 65 - 74, XP004081710 [Y] 1,2,7-9,12,15 * page 65, column L, line 1 - page 69, column L, line 17 * * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-739X(97)89112-1 | [A] - FERREIRA R, "THE PRACTICAL APPLICATION OF STATE OF THE ART SECURITY IN REAL ENVIRONMENTS", ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY - AUSCRYPT. SYDNEY, JAN. 8 - 11, 1990, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CRYPTOLOGY - AUSCRYPT, BERLIN, SPRINGER, DE, (19900108), vol. CONF. 1, ISBN 3-540-53000-2, pages 334 - 355, XP000145211 [A] 6 * page 351, paragraph 3 - page 352, paragraph 2 * | Examination | US5913214 | EP1089194 |