EP1434850 - HIGH-THROUGHPUT ELECTROPHYSIOLOGICAL MEASUREMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.10.2007 [2007/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essen Instruments, Inc. 3909 Research Park Drive, Suite 400 Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | [2004/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHROEDER, Kirk, S. 1102 Lariat Loop ,Apt.202 Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | 02 /
NEAGLE, Bradley, D. 5415 Vorhies Roa Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | [2005/03] |
Former [2004/28] | 01 /
SCHROEDER, Kirk, S. 4103 Lake Forest Drive West Ann Arbor, MI 48108 / US | ||
02 /
NEAGLE, Bradley, D. 5415 Vorhies Roa Ann Arbor, MI 48105 / US | Representative(s) | Besse, François ANDRE ROLAND SA Chemin des Charmettes 9 P.O. Box 5107 1002 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/28] | Besse, François ANDRE ROLAND IPS, 15, Avenue Tissot, P.O. Box 1255 1001 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 02780275.0 | 05.09.2002 | [2004/28] | WO2002US28398 | Priority number, date | US20010317112P | 05.09.2001 Original published format: US 317112 P | WO2002US16122 | 21.05.2002 Original published format: PCT/US02/16122 | US20020383196P | 22.05.2002 Original published format: US 383196 P | [2004/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03021230 | Date: | 13.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1434850 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/42, G01N27/416 | [2004/28] | CPC: |
G01N33/48728 (EP);
G01N2035/00237 (EP);
G01N2035/1034 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROPHYSIOLOGISCHES MESSSYSTEM MIT HOHEM DURCHSATZ | [2004/28] | English: | HIGH-THROUGHPUT ELECTROPHYSIOLOGICAL MEASUREMENT SYSTEM | [2004/28] | French: | SYSTEME DE MESURE ELECTROPHYSIOLOGIQUE DE GRANDE CAPACITE | [2004/28] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/28] | 01.04.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/43] | 01.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]US6368851 ; | [XE]US6488829 ; | [YP]US6377057 ; | [Y]US2001005774 ; | [Y]US4071315 ; | [Y]US4952518 ; | [Y]US5508200 ; | [Y]US2001005489 ; | [Y]US5169600 ; | [Y]US6132582 ; | [Y]US5632957 ; | [Y]US5262128 ; | [AE]US6461860 ; | [AE]US6470226 ; | [A]US6063260 |