EP1487988 - NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND SECRETED POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuvelo Inc. 670 Almanor Avenue Sunnyville, CA 94086 / US | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Y., Tom 4230 Ranwick Court San Jose, CA 95118 / CH | 02 /
ASUNDI, Vinod 709 Foster City Boulevard Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 03 /
GOODRICH, Ryle, W. 3461 Saint Susan Place Los Angeles, CA 90066 / US | 04 /
REN, Feiyan 7703 Oak Meadow Court Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Jie 4930 Poplar Terrace Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 06 /
ZHAO, Qing, A. 1556 Kooser Road San Jose, CA 95118 / US | 07 /
WANG, Jian-Rui 744 Stendhal Lane Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 08 /
GHOSH, Malabika 620 Iris Avenue, Apt. 133 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 09 /
XUE, Aidong, J. 1621 South Mary Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 10 /
WEHRMAN, Tom, CCSR Mol Pharm 3210 269 W. Campus Dr. Stanford, CA 94305 / US | 11 /
WENG, Gezhi 415 Moraga Avenue Piedmont, CA 94611 / US | 12 /
ZHOU, Ping 7595 Newcastle Drive Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 13 /
DRMANAC, Radoje, T. 850 East Greenwich Place Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/52] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Boeters & Lieck, Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02780320.4 | 18.09.2002 | [2004/52] | WO2002US29636 | Priority number, date | US20010323349P | 18.09.2001 Original published format: US 323349 P | US20020245817 | 16.09.2002 Original published format: US 245817 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03025142 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1487988 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.10.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C12N15/12 | [2005/33] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [2004/52] | C12P21/02, C12N15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE NUKLEINSÄUREN UND SEZERNIERTE POLYPEPTIDE | [2004/52] | English: | NOVEL NUCLEIC ACIDS AND SECRETED POLYPEPTIDES | [2004/52] | French: | NOUVEAUX ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET POLYPEPTIDES SECRETES | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2004 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 20.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0157188 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [X] - "Homo sapiens cDNA clone:BMFBFB12, 5'end, expressed in CD34+ hematopoietic stem/progenitor cells.", EMBL, (20001013), Database accession no. AV757045, URL: EBI, XP002327761 [X] 2,10-12,16-18,20,21 * the whole document * | [X] - "Interleukin-8 precursor (IL-8) (Monocyte-derived neutrophil chemotactic factor) (MDNCF) (T-cell chemotactic factor) (Neutrophil- activating protein 1) (NAP-1) (Lymphocyte-derived neutrophil-activating factor) (LYNAP) (Protein 3-10C) (Neutrofil-activating factor) (NAF) ...", SWISSPROT, (19890301), Database accession no. P10145, URL: NCBI, XP002327760 [X] 2,10-12,16-18 * the whole document * | [X] - "Homo sapiens cDNA clone:DCBAFD02, 5'end, expressed in human dendritic cells.", EMBL, (20001005), Database accession no. AV716041, URL: EBI, XP002327762 [X] 2 * the whole document * | [ ] - MATSUSHIMA K ET AL, "Molecular cloning of a human monocyte-derived neutrophil chemotactic factor (MDNCF) and the induction of MDNCF mRNA by interleukin 1 and tumor necrosis factor.", THE JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE. 1 JUN 1988, (19880601), vol. 167, no. 6, ISSN 0022-1007, pages 1883 - 1893, XP002327759 [ ] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.167.6.1883 | International search | [X] - GENBANK, (20001009), Database accession no. AV712481, XP002979584 |