EP1435988 - IMPROVED USE OF ANTITUMORAL COMPOUND IN CANCER THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmamar S.A. c/ Calera 3 28760 Tres Cantos / ES | [2004/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIMENO, Jose Camino Alto 40 28792 Miraflores de la Sierra, Madrid / ES | 02 /
RUIZ Casado, Ana Calle San Sebastian 2-1 4 28230 Las Rozas / ES | 03 /
LOPEZ LAZARO, Luis Calle Ferrer del Rio 3, Escalera B,3 2 28028 Madrid / ES | 04 /
ROWINSKY, Eric Institute for Drug Development Suite 700 8122 Datapoint Drive San Antonio, TX 78229 / US | 05 /
HIDALGO, Manuel The Johns Hopkins Oncology Ctr. Bunting Blaustein Cancer R. Bld 1-M88 1650 Orleans Baltimore, MD 21231-1 / US | [2004/41] |
Former [2004/29] | 01 /
JIMENO, Jose Pharmamar S.A. c/Calera, 3 E-28760 Tres Cantos / ES | ||
02 /
RUIZ Casado, Ana Pharmamar S.A. c/Calera, 3 E-28760 Tres Cantos / ES | |||
03 /
LOPEZ Lazaro, Luis Pharmamar S.A. c/Calera, 3 E-28760 Tres Cantos / ES | |||
04 /
ROWINSKY, Eric Institute for Drug Development Suite 700 8122 Datapoint Drive San Antonio, TX 78229 / US | |||
05 /
HIDALGO, Manuel The Johns Hopkins Oncology Ctr. Bunting Blaustein Cancer R. Bld 1-M88 1650 Orleans Baltimore, MD 21231-1 / US | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | ||
Former [2004/29] | Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk, 66-68 Hills Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02780496.2 | 21.10.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002US33548 | Priority number, date | US20010348414P | 19.10.2001 Original published format: US 348414 P | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03039571 | Date: | 15.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1435988 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4995, A61P35/00, // A61K45/06 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
A61K31/704 (EP,US);
A61K31/495 (KR);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/4995 (EP,US);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/704, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/24, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/29] | A61K38/00, A61K38/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | 02.04.2004 | LT | 02.04.2004 | LV | 02.04.2004 | MK | 02.04.2004 | RO | 02.04.2004 | SI | 02.04.2004 | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE VERWENDUNG EINER ANTITUMORALEN VERBINDUNG IN DER KREBSTHERAPIE | [2004/29] | English: | IMPROVED USE OF ANTITUMORAL COMPOUND IN CANCER THERAPY | [2004/29] | French: | UTILISATION AMELIOREE DE COMPOSE ANTI-TUMORAL DANS LE TRAITEMENT DES CANCERS | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 02.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 12.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/46] | 30.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]WO0069441 (PHARMA MAR SA [ES], et al) [XD] 14-18 * the whole document * [Y] 19; | [Y]WO0069862 (PHARMA MAR SA [ES], et al) [Y] 15-17,19 * page 47, paragraph 4 - page 50 *; | [Y]WO0177115 (PHARMA MAR SA [ES], et al) [Y] 15-17,19 * page 32, paragraph 4 - page 33, paragraph 3 * * page 54 - page 57 *; | [PY]WO0187894 (PHARMA MAR SA [ES], et al) [PY] 15-17,19 * page 1 * * page 10, paragraph L * * page 12 ** pages 85-87,89,90,92,93 *; | [PX]WO0236135 (PHARMA MAR SA [ES], et al) [PX] 14-18 * the whole document *; | [XY] - DELALOGE S ET AL, "Ecteinascidin-743: A marine-derived compounds in advanced, pretreated sarcoma patients--preliminary evidence of activity", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, GRUNE AND STRATTON, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20010301), vol. 19, no. 5, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 1248 - 1255, XP002959599 [X] 14-18 * the whole document * [Y] 19 | [XDY] - TAAMMA A ET AL, "Phase I and pharmacokinetic study of ecteinascidin-743, a new marine compound, administered as a 24-hour continuous infusion in patients with solid tumors", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, GRUNE AND STRATTON, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20010301), vol. 19, no. 5, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 1256 - 1265, XP002959600 [XD] 14,18 * the whole document * [Y] 15-17,19 | [XDY] - RYAN D P ET AL, "Phase I and pharmacokinetics study of ecteinascidin 743 administered as a 72-hour continuous intravenous infusion in patients with solid malignancies", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (200102), vol. 7, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 231 - 242, XP002959598 [XD] 14,18 [Y] 15-17,19 | [X] - MARTINEZ E J ET AL, "PHTHALASCIDIN, A SYNTHETIC ANTITUMOR AGENT WITH POTENCY AND MODE OFACTION COMPARABLE TO ECTEINASCIDIN 743", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199903), vol. 96, no. 7, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3496 - 3501, XP001026021 [X] 14,18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.7.3496 | International search | [A]US5089273 (RINEHART KENNETH L [US], et al); | [A]US5256663 (RINEHART KENNETH [US], et al); | [A]US5478932 (RINEHART KENNETH L [US], et al); | [A] - RYAN ET AL., "Phase I and pharmacokinetics study of ecteinascidin 743 administered as a 72-hour continuous intravenous infusion in patients with solid malignancies", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 7, pages 231 - 242, XP002959598 | [A] - DELALOGE ET AL., "Ecteinascidin-743: A marine-derived compounds in advanced, pretreated sarcoma patients--preliminary evidence of activity", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (200103), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 1248 - 1255, XP002959599 | [A] - TAAMMA ET AL., "Phase I and pharmacokinetic study of ecteinascidin-743, a new marine compound, administered as a 24-hour continuous infusion in patients with solid tumors", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, (200103), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 1256 - 1265, XP002959600 |