EP1399901 - DUAL AXIS MAGNETIC FIELD DEVICE FOR CHANGING STATUS OF EAS MARKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2004/13] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELKA, Anthony, M. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
JESME, Ronald, D. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
ZAREMBO, Peter, J. Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2004/13] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/13] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02780746.0 | 09.04.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002US11243 | Priority number, date | US20010882790 | 15.06.2001 Original published format: US 882790 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02103650 | Date: | 27.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1399901 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399901 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/24 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
G08B13/2411 (EP,US);
G08B13/2417 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELACHSENMAGNETFELDEINRICHTUNG FÜR ÄNDERUNG DES STATUS EINER EAS-MARKIERUNG | [2004/13] | English: | DUAL AXIS MAGNETIC FIELD DEVICE FOR CHANGING STATUS OF EAS MARKER | [2004/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF A DEUX AXES ET CHAMP MAGNETIQUE POUVANT MODIFIER L'ETAT D'UN MARQUEUR EAS | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 12.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | CH | 30.11.2005 | CY | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | IT | 30.11.2005 | LI | 30.11.2005 | NL | 30.11.2005 | TR | 30.11.2005 | DK | 28.02.2006 | GR | 28.02.2006 | ES | 13.03.2006 | LU | 09.04.2006 | IE | 10.04.2006 | MC | 30.04.2006 | PT | 02.05.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
TR | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
LU | 09.04.2006 | ||
IE | 10.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
IE | 10.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
IE | 10.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
MC | 30.04.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5059951 (KALTNER GEORGE W [US]) [A] 11,12 * abstract *; | [X]WO9508177 (KNOGO CORP [US]) [X] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]US5867101 (COPELAND RICHARD L [US], et al) [A] 18,19* abstract *; | [A]US6111507 (ALICOT JORGE FERNANDO [US], et al) [A] 16 * column 11, line 6 - line 22; figure 9A *; | [X]EP1049115 (BRAILLON MAGNETIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-19 * column 6, line 12 - line 55; figure 7 *; | [A]US6232870 (GARBER SHARON R [US], et al) [A] 13 * abstract * |