EP1386758 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Fumio c/o Bridgestone Corporation 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | [2007/42] |
Former [2004/06] | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Fumio c/o Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/06] | Whalley, Kevin MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02780776.7 | 10.05.2002 | [2004/06] | WO2002JP04567 | Priority number, date | JP20010141646 | 11.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001141646 | JP20010231795 | 31.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001231795 | JP20010371236 | 05.12.2001 Original published format: JP 2001371236 | [2004/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02102611 | Date: | 27.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1386758 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1386758 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/11, B60C11/01, B60C11/13 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
B60C11/1384 (EP,US);
B60C11/11 (EP,US);
B60C11/13 (EP,US);
Y10S152/902 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/06] | B60C11/11, B60C11/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2007/13] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN | [2004/06] | English: | PNEUMATIC TIRE | [2004/06] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE | [2004/06] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2003 | Translation filed | 03.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2003 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH092021 ; | [X]EP0705718 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-9,12,13,15,16,22-25 * page 5, lines 1-4; figures 1-3; claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970530), vol. 1997, no. 05, & JP09002021 A 19970107 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [X] 1-5,7-9,12,13,15,16,22-25 * abstract * | International search | [XE]JP2002114011 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [X]EP0925957 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]); | [X]EP0895876 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]); | [XE]JP2002059711 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [A]EP0652119 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]); | [A]JPS63137003U |