EP1399258 - PROCESS FOR THE ACTIVATION OF ZEOLITIC CATALYSTS CONTAINING TITANIUM AND THEIR USE IN OXIDATION REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polimeri Europa S.p.A. Via E. Fermi, 4 72100 Brindisi / IT | [2004/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARCA, Vittorio Via Venturini 154 I-30015 Chioggia / IT | 02 /
BOSCOLO BOSCOLETTO, Angelo Viale Veneto 35 I-30019 Sottomarina / IT | 03 /
FRACASSO, Nicola Via V. Veneto 48/A I-30031 Dolo-Venezia / IT | 04 /
FURLAN, Piero Via Ghirada 3/D I-31100 Treviso / IT | 05 /
MEDA, Laura Via Varallino 81 I-28066 Galliate-Novara / IT | [2004/18] |
Former [2004/13] | 01 /
ARCA, Vittorio Via Venturini 154 I-30015 Chioggia / IT | ||
02 /
BOSCOLO BOSCOLETTO, Angelo Viale Veneto 35 I-30019 Sottomarina / IT | |||
03 /
FRACASSO, Nicola Viale della Resistenza 24/B I-30031 Dolo / IT | |||
04 /
FURLAN, Piero Via Ghirada 3/D I-31100 Treviso / IT | |||
05 /
MEDA, Laura Via Varallino 81 I-28066 Galliate-Novara / IT | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/13] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02780900.3 | 12.06.2002 | [2004/13] | WO2002EP06500 | Priority number, date | IT2001MI01363 | 28.06.2001 Original published format: IT MI20011363 | [2004/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03002254 | Date: | 09.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1399258 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.01.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1399258 | Date: | 06.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01J29/04, C07C249/04, C07C251/44 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
B01J29/89 (EP,US);
B01J37/12 (KR);
C07C249/04 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C249/04, C07C251/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/14] |
Former [2004/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AKTIVIERUNG VON TITANHALTIGEN ZEOLITHISCHEN KATALYSATOREN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG BEI OXIDATIONSREAKTIONEN | [2004/13] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE ACTIVATION OF ZEOLITIC CATALYSTS CONTAINING TITANIUM AND THEIR USE IN OXIDATION REACTIONS | [2004/13] | French: | PROCEDE D'ACTIVATION DE CATALYSEURS ZEOLITIQUES CONTENANT DU TITANE ET UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI DANS DES REACTIONS D'OXYDATION | [2004/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 21.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2006
20.01.2006
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Altmann, Andreas Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2006
20.01.2006
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Altmann, Andreas Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2006/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.01.2006
BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Altmann, Andreas Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | 13.02.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.10.2006 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.08.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.12.2007 | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.08.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/01] | 14.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0712852 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) [X] 1 * page 4, line 18 - line 27 * * claims 1,2,11,12 *; | [Y]EP0735017 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) [Y] 20,21 * claims 1-3 *; | [XY]US5591875 (CHANG TE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-11,14,15,18,19 * column 4, line 32 - column 6, line 59 * * claims 1,6,7 * [Y] 20,21; | [X]US5695736 (SAXTON ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * claim 1 * * column 4, line 15 - line 40 *; | [X]US5756778 (THIELE GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * example 15 *; | [A]EP0930308 (ENICHEM SPA [IT]) |