EP1549558 - ADAPTER AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.08.2007 [2007/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PI-DESIGN AG Kantonstrasse 6234 Triengen / CH | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BODUM, Jorgen St. Niklausen Strasse 23 CH-6005 St. Niklausen / CH | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Stellinger, Jens-Holger Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Stellinger, Jens-Holger Chas. Hude A/S H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1780 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 02781163.7 | 11.10.2002 | [2005/27] | WO2002DK00684 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004033335 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1549558 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/24, // A61J9/04 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
B67D3/044 (EP,US);
A47J31/44 (EP,US);
A47J31/46 (EP,US);
F16K17/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | B65D51/24, // A61J9:04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 06.04.2005 | LV | 06.04.2005 | MK | Not yet paid | RO | 06.04.2005 | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTER UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2005/27] | English: | ADAPTER AND ITS USE | [2005/27] | French: | ADAPTATEUR ET SON UTILISATION | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 04.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/33] | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5431205 (GEBHARD ALBERT W [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4640426 (WASLEY BERNARD [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2271348 (CETINDAMAR FARUK [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9820832 (SULIMAN ISAM A [SE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * |