EP1440116 - MATTE, BIAXIALLLY ORIENTED POLYESTER FOIL, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND ITS UTILIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Polyester Film GmbH Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2004/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARTSCH, Stefan Dörrgasse 17 65199 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
PEIFFER, Herbert Thüringer Strasse 26 55126 Mainz / DE | 03 /
JANSSENS, Bart Bodenstedtstrabe 10 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2004/44] |
Former [2004/31] | 01 /
BARTSCH, Stefan Dörrgasse 17 65199 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
02 /
PEIFFER, Herbert Thüringer Strasse 26 55126 Mainz / DE | |||
03 /
JANSSENS, Bart Klopstockstrasse 4 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Representative(s) | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Plate Schweitzer Zounek Patentanwälte Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2006/06] | Schweitzer, Klaus, et al Zounek Plate Schweitzer Patentanwaltskanzlei Rheingaustrasse 196 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2004/31] | Schweitzer, Klaus, Dr. Patentanwaltskanzlei Zounek, Industriepark Kalle-Albert, Gebäude H391 Rheingaustrasse 190-196 65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 02781240.3 | 11.10.2002 | [2004/31] | WO2002EP11401 | Priority number, date | DE2001152141 | 23.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10152141 | [2004/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03035726 | Date: | 01.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1440116 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, B29C70/64, // (B29C55/12, C08L67:02) | [2004/31] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C55/12 (EP,US);
B29C70/64 (EP,US);
B29C48/00 (EP,US);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/31] | Title | German: | MATTE, BIAXIAL ORIENTIERTE POLYESTERFOLIE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2004/31] | English: | MATTE, BIAXIALLLY ORIENTED POLYESTER FOIL, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND ITS UTILIZATION | [2004/31] | French: | FILM MAT EN POLYESTER BIORIENTE, SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET SON UTILISATION | [2004/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 17.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0671746 ; | [A]JPH04117431 ; | [DA]US3154461 (JOHNSON DOUGLAS L) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0586161 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,9,13 * claims 1,11 * * examples 1-5 * * page 2, line 42 - line 44 *; | [A]EP0606663 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,7 *; | [A]EP0674988 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,7,8 * claims 1,7 * * page 6, line 46 - line 51 *; | [A]US5473004 (ONO TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,5 ** column 4, line 12 - line 15 *; | [X]WO0140357 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [X] * claims 1,4 *; | [PX]EP1174457 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [PX] 1,2,4,6,13 * claims 1-3 * * page 6, line 53 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 15, Database accession no. 1994-123780, XP002229661 & JPH0671746 A 19940315 (TORAY IND INC) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920810), vol. 016, no. 369, Database accession no. (C - 0972), & JP04117431 A 19920417 (DIAFOIL CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |