EP1451698 - HIGH-SPEED INTERCHIP INTERFACE PROTOCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAYNE, Robert, L. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
EVOY, David, R. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
PONTIUS, Timothy, A. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
SPATZ, George Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | White, Andrew Gordon, et al NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd Betchworth House Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | White, Andrew Gordon, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2004/36] | Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02781542.2 | 14.11.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002IB04818 | Priority number, date | US20010997609 | 29.11.2001 Original published format: US 997609 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03046731 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1451698 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451698 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
G06F13/126 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITS-INTERCHIP-SCHNITTSTELLENPROTOKOLL | [2004/36] | English: | HIGH-SPEED INTERCHIP INTERFACE PROTOCOL | [2004/36] | French: | PROTOCOLE D'INTERFACE ENTRE PUCES A VITESSE ELEVEE | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.2006 | BE | 02.11.2006 | CH | 02.11.2006 | CY | 02.11.2006 | CZ | 02.11.2006 | EE | 02.11.2006 | FI | 02.11.2006 | IT | 02.11.2006 | LI | 02.11.2006 | NL | 02.11.2006 | SK | 02.11.2006 | TR | 02.11.2006 | IE | 14.11.2006 | LU | 14.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | BG | 02.02.2007 | DK | 02.02.2007 | SE | 02.02.2007 | GR | 03.02.2007 | ES | 13.02.2007 | PT | 02.04.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
EE | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IT | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
TR | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 14.11.2006 | ||
LU | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
EE | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IT | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IT | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
GR | 03.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IT | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
IE | 14.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IT | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
SK | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
IT | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
DK | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
PT | 02.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
BE | 02.11.2006 | ||
CH | 02.11.2006 | ||
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
LI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 02.11.2006 | |
FI | 02.11.2006 | ||
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 02.11.2006 | |
NL | 02.11.2006 | ||
BG | 02.02.2007 | ||
SE | 02.02.2007 | ||
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/21] | NL | 02.11.2006 | |
ES | 13.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | NL | 02.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5729573 (BAILEY JAY PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 11, line 25 - column 12, line 40 *; | [A] - ECHELON, Parallel I/O Interface to the Neuron Chip, (19950101), XP002241355 [A] 1-15 * pages 3-11 * |