EP1451797 - ELECTROLUMINESCENT DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNTER, Iain, M. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
JOHNSON, Mark, T. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
CHILDS, Mark, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/36] | Williamson, Paul Lewis Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02781579.4 | 20.11.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002IB04907 | Priority number, date | GB20010028419 | 28.11.2001 Original published format: GB 0128419 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03046877 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1451797 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,US);
G09G3/30 (KR);
G09G3/20 (KR);
G09G3/3258 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0842 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0221 (EP,US);
G09G2320/046 (EP,US);
G09G2330/022 (EP,US);
G09G3/2014 (EP,US);
G09G3/2074 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROLUMINESZIERENDE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2004/36] | English: | ELECTROLUMINESCENT DISPLAY DEVICE | [2004/36] | French: | AFFICHAGE ELECTROLUMINESCENT | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 12.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/39] | 08.05.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.05.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9942983 (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,11-13,16-20 * the whole document *; | [X]US6023259 (HOWARD WEBSTER E [US], et al) [X] 1-7,16-18* column W * | Examination | US5874933 | US6137466 | WO0148731 |