EP1454360 - TRENCH MOSFET DEVICE WITH IMPROVED ON−RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL SEMICONDUCTOR, Inc. 10 Melville Park Road Melville, NY 11747 / US | [2004/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSHIEH, Fwu-Iuan 20768 Sevilla Lane Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 02 /
SO, Koon, Chong, c/o General Semiconductor, Inc. 10 Melville Park Road Melville, NY 11747 / US | 03 /
AMATO, John, E. 585 Pacheco Drive Tracy, CA 95376 / US | 04 /
TSUI, Yan, Man 4409 Drywood Court Union City, CA 94587 / US | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/37] | 01 /
HSHIEH, Fwu-Iuan 20768 Sevilla Lane Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | ||
02 /
SO, Koon, Chong 591 Woodview Terrace Fremont, CA 94539 / US | |||
03 /
AMATO, John, E. 585 Pacheco Drive Tracy, CA 95376 / US | |||
04 /
TSUI, Yan, Man 4409 Drywood Court Union City, CA 94587 / US | Representative(s) | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al Jungblut & Seuss Patentanwälte Wittestraße 30 J 13509 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al JUNGBLUT & SEUSS Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2004/37] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, Dr., et al Albrecht, Lüke & Jungblut, Patentanwälte, Gelfertstrasse 56 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 02782334.3 | 20.11.2002 | [2004/37] | WO2002US37265 | Priority number, date | US20010999116 | 21.11.2001 Original published format: US 999116 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03046997 | Date: | 05.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1454360 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H01L21/336, H01L29/08, H01L29/36 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
H01L29/7813 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02521 (KR);
H01L21/0455 (KR);
H01L29/0878 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/66734 (EP);
H01L29/7812 (KR);
H01L2924/13091 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/37] | H01L29/76, H01L29/94, H01L31/062, H01L31/113, H01L31/119, H01L29/74, H01L21/336, H01L21/3205, H01L21/8238, H01L21/4763, H01L21/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRABEN-MOSFET-BAUELEMENT MIT VERBESSERTEM ON-WIDERSTAND | [2004/37] | English: | TRENCH MOSFET DEVICE WITH IMPROVED ON−RESISTANCE | [2004/37] | French: | TRANSISTOR MOS A TRANCHEE PRESENTANT UNE MEILLEURE RESISTANCE A L'ETAT PASSANT | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 09.07.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/26] | 26.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/51] | 16.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/51] | 08.03.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/35] | 08.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/35] | 12.04.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.04.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 26.04.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2011 | Decision despatched | Request for re-establishment of rights: | 16.08.2010 | Date of receipt | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4893160 (BLANCHARD RICHARD A [US]) [X] 1-10 * figure 4 and associated text *; | [X]US5442214 (YANG SHENG-HSING [TW]) [X] 1-10 * figure 2 and associated text *; | [X]EP1113501 (SILICONIX INC [US]) [X] 1-7,10* figures 8,14 and associated text *; | [X]US6262453 (HSHIEH FWU-IUAN [US]) [X] 1-10 * figures 2,3 and associated text * | International search | [X]US5442214 (YANG SHENG-HSING [TW]); | [Y]US6084268 (DE FRESART EDOUARD D [US], et al) |