EP1436297 - PHOTOACTIVABLE NITROGEN BASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [2004/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUDIN, Gisèle Baselmattweg 141 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | 02 /
DIETLIKER, Kurt Baselmattweg 132 CH-4123 Allschwil / CH | 03 /
JUNG, Tunja Eggbergstrasse 19 79618 Rheinfelden-Herten / DE | [2004/29] | Application number, filing date | 02782851.6 | 08.10.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002EP11238 | Priority number, date | CH20010001911 | 17.10.2001 Original published format: CH 19112001 | [2004/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03033500 | Date: | 24.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436297 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1436297 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D519/00, G03F7/004 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0045 (EP,US);
G03F7/0295 (EP,US);
G03F7/031 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/29] | C07D487/04, C07D519/00, G03F7/004, // C07D487/04, C07D239/00, C07D209/00, C07D487/04, C07D239/00, C07D223/00, C07D519/00, C07D487/00, C07D487/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHOTOAKTIVIERBARE STICKSTOFFBASEN | [2004/29] | English: | PHOTOACTIVABLE NITROGEN BASES | [2004/29] | French: | BASES D'AZOTE PHOTOSENSIBLES | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.04.2007 | BE | 25.04.2007 | CH | 25.04.2007 | CY | 25.04.2007 | CZ | 25.04.2007 | DK | 25.04.2007 | EE | 25.04.2007 | FI | 25.04.2007 | LI | 25.04.2007 | SK | 25.04.2007 | TR | 25.04.2007 | BG | 25.07.2007 | GR | 26.07.2007 | ES | 05.08.2007 | PT | 25.09.2007 | IE | 08.10.2007 | LU | 08.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CY | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
EE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
IE | 08.10.2007 | ||
LU | 08.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CY | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
EE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
IE | 08.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
EE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
IE | 08.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
IE | 08.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
CH | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | CH | 25.04.2007 | |
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
LI | 25.04.2007 | ||
ES | 05.08.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 05.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9841524 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 1,8-10,17* claims 1,2,11-14,20 *; | [X] - JONES, RAYMOND C. F. ET AL, "Nucleophilic attack on 2-(4-oxoalkyl)-2-imidazolines: a novel route to tetrahydropyridines and piperidines", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS (1989), 30(39), 5365-8, XP002230709 [X] 1 * page 5367, compounds 12a, 12b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)93788-8 |