EP1436823 - METHOD FOR LOCALIZED GROWTH OF NANOTUBES AND METHOD FOR MAKING A SELF-ALIGNED CATHODE USING THE NANOTUBE GROWTH METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales 173, boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [2004/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEGAGNEUX, Pierre, Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Prés. Salvador Allende F-94117 Arcueilcedex / FR | 02 /
PIRIO, Gilles, Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Prés. Salvador Allende F-94117 Arcueil cedex / FR | 03 /
PRIBAT, Didier, Thales Intellectual Property 13, avenue du Prés. Salvador Allende F-94117 Arcueil cedex / FR | 04 /
MILNE, William Ireland, University of Cambridge Trumpington Street Cambridge CB2 1PZ / GB | 05 /
TEO, Kenneth Boh Khin, University of Cambridge Truumpington Street Cambridge CB2 1PZ / GB | [2004/29] | Representative(s) | Esselin, Sophie Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/29] | Esselin, Sophie THALES Intellectual Property, 31-33 avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02783188.2 | 20.09.2002 | [2004/29] | WO2002FR03228 | Priority number, date | FR20010012222 | 20.09.2001 Original published format: FR 0112222 | [2004/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03025966 | Date: | 27.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1436823 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1436823 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/02, C01B31/02 | [2004/29] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
H01J9/025 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2005/22] |
Former [2004/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR LOKALISIERTES WACHSTUM VON NANORÖHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SELBSTAUSGERICHTETEN KATHODE MIT DEM NANORÖHRENWACHSTUMSVERFAHREN | [2004/29] | English: | METHOD FOR LOCALIZED GROWTH OF NANOTUBES AND METHOD FOR MAKING A SELF-ALIGNED CATHODE USING THE NANOTUBE GROWTH METHOD | [2004/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE CROISSANCE LOCALISEE DE NANOTUBES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CATHODE AUTOALIGNEE UTILISANT LE PROCEDE DE CROISSANCE DE NANOTUBES | [2004/29] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 11.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5872422 (XU XUEPING [US], et al) [A] 1,9* claims 23,40-67 *; | [A]EP0913508 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,9 * claims 17-35 *; | [A]US6062931 (CHUANG FENG-YU [TW], et al) [A] 9 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP1129990 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,6-8 * page 5, line 22 - page 6, line 21; claims 1,10,18 * |