EP1451439 - GRIPPING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherford/Lamb, Inc. 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | For all designated states Niven, David 24 Turakina Street New Plymouth / NZ | [N/P] |
Former [2006/04] | For all designated states WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC. 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | ||
For all designated states Niven, David 24 Turakina Street New Plymouth / NZ | |||
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC. 515 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 600 Houston Texas 77027 / US | ||
For all designated states Niven, David 24 Turakina Street New Plymouth / NZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIVEN, David 24 Turakina Street New Plymouth / NZ | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02783244.3 | 26.11.2002 | [2004/36] | WO2002GB05320 | Priority number, date | NZ20010515919 | 04.12.2001 Original published format: NZ 51591901 | [2004/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03048507 | Date: | 12.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1451439 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1451439 | Date: | 25.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E21B19/16, B25B13/46, B25B13/50 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
F16D41/069 (EP,US);
B25B13/462 (EP,US);
E21B19/161 (EP,US);
F16D41/067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | GB [2006/04] |
Former [2004/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | GREIFVORRICHTUNG | [2004/36] | English: | GRIPPING APPARATUS | [2004/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE | [2004/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 14.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO0181046 (BALL BURNISHING MACH TOOLS [GB], et al) [X] 20-22,25-28 * page 10, line 20 - page 13, line 22 * * figures 1A-1E * [A] 1,15,19; | [A]US4827808 (HAYNES CHARLES W [US], et al) [A] 1,15,19,20 * column 2, line 16 - column 5, line 57; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US3748702 (BROWN C) [A] 1,15,19,20 * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 25; figure 10 * |