EP1454308 - AN APPARATUS FOR USE IN TRAINING AN OPERATOR IN THE USE OF AN ENDOSCOPE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEYMED (MEDICAL & INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED KeyMed House Stock Road Southend-on-Sea Essex SS2 5QH / GB | [2012/17] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states KEYMED (MEDICAL & INDUSTRIAL EQUIPMENT) LIMITED KeyMed House Stock Road Southend-on-Sea Essex SS2 5QH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALLAKER, Daniel, Mark 94 New Road Gt. Wakering, Essex SS3 0AS / GB | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Draper, Martyn John, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Draper, Martyn John, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2004/37] | Draper, Martyn John, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02783323.5 | 11.12.2002 | [2004/37] | WO2002GB05607 | Priority number, date | GB20010029593 | 11.12.2001 Original published format: GB 0129593 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03050783 | Date: | 19.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1454308 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1454308 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G09B23/28 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G09B23/285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/37] | Title | German: | TRAININGSGERÄT ZUR ANWENDUNG IN EINEM ENDOSKOPISCHEN SYSTEM | [2004/37] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR USE IN TRAINING AN OPERATOR IN THE USE OF AN ENDOSCOPE SYSTEM | [2004/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF UTILISE DANS LA FORMATION D'UN OPERATEUR A UTILISER UN SYSTEME D'ENDOSCOPE | [2004/37] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 29.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 15.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 15.03.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.04.2012 | BE | 25.04.2012 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | TR | 25.04.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | ES | 05.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | IE | 11.12.2012 | LU | 11.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
IE | 11.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5821920 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al); | [YD]EP0970714 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [A]US6024576 (BEVIRT JOEBEN [US], et al); | [Y]US6300937 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US]) |