EP1439225 - DR5 GENE PROMOTER AND SIAH-1 GENE PROMOTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oncolys BioPharma Inc 2-3-9, Roppongi Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2005/46] |
Former [2004/30] | For all designated states Kansai Technology Licensing Organization Co., Ltd. 93, Chudoji Awata-cho, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8815 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAI, Toshiyuki 28-11, Matsugasaki Kowaki-cho, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-0957 / JP | [2004/30] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/30] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02783337.5 | 04.10.2002 | [2004/30] | WO2002IB04074 | Priority number, date | JP20010309179 | 04.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001309179 | [2004/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03038087 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1439225 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.05.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/09, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, G01N33/15, G01N33/50, G01N33/566, C07K14/705, C07K14/47 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6897 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/30] | C12N15/09, C12N5/10, C12Q1/68, G01N33/15, G01N33/50, G01N33/566 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DR5-GEN-PROMOTOR UND SIAH-1-GEN-PROMOTOR | [2004/30] | English: | DR5 GENE PROMOTER AND SIAH-1 GENE PROMOTER | [2004/30] | French: | PROMOTEUR DU GENE DR5 ET PROMOTEUR DU GENE SIAH-1 | [2004/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2004 | Translation filed | 22.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 22.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/30] | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - "Homo sapiens DR5 gene for death receptor 5, promoter and partial cds.", EMBL, (20010322), Database accession no. AB054004, URL: EBI, XP002330065 [X] 1-5,10-13,18,19 * the whole document * | [PX] - YOSHIDA^A T ET AL, "Promoter structure and transcription initiation sites of the human death receptor 5/TRAIL-R2 gene<1>", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20011102), vol. 507, no. 3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 381 - 385, XP004320958 [PX] 1-5,10-13,18,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(01)02947-7 | [A] - GEN SHENG WU ET AL, "KILLER/DR5 is a DNA damage-inducible p53-regulated death receptor gene", NATURE GENETICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199710), vol. 17, no. 2, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 141 - 143, XP002083924 [A] 1-5,10-13,18,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1097-141 | [A] - WU G S ET AL, "KILLER/DR5, A NOVEL DNA-DAMAGE INDUCIBLE DEATH RECEPTOR GENE, LINKSTHE P53-TUMOR SUPPRESSOR TO CASPASE ACTIVATION AND APOPTOTIC DEATH", ADVANCES IN EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, SPRING ST., NY, US, (2000), vol. 465, ISSN 0065-2598, pages 143 - 151, XP001016228 [A] 1-5,10-13,18,19 * the whole document * | [X] - SOWA Y ET AL, "BUTYRATE AS A MODEL FOR GENE-REGULATING CHEMOPREVENTION AND CHEMOTHERAPY", BIOFACTORS, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (2000), vol. 12, no. 1-4, ISSN 0951-6433, pages 283 - 287, XP009050386 [X] 1-13,18,19 * abstract * * page 285, paragraph 1 - page 286, paragraph L * * page 284, paragraph 2 * | [A] - NE ET AL, "ACTIVATION OF THE HUMAN HOMOLOGUE OF THE DROSOPHILA SINA GENE IN APOPTOSIS AND TUMOR SUPPRESSION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19960820), vol. 93, no. 17, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9039 - 9042, XP000611649 [A] 6-13,18,19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.17.9039 | [A] - LIU J ET AL, "SIAH-1 MEDIATES A NOVEL BETA-CATENIN DEGRADATION PATHWAY LINKING P53 TO THE ADENOMATOUS POLYPOSIS COLI PROTEIN", MOLECULAR CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, MA, US, (200105), vol. 7, ISSN 1097-2765, pages 927 - 936, XP002949014 [A] 6-13,18,19 * abstract * * page 927, paragraph L - page 928, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1097-2765(01)00241-6 | [PX] - MAEDA A ET AL, "The characterization of the human Siah-1 promoter<1>", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020213), vol. 512, no. 1-3, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 223 - 226, XP004341382 [PX] 5-13,18,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(02)02265-2 | International search | [Y]WO9841629 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO0066156 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [Y] - PAN G. ET AL., "An antagonist decoy receptor and a death domain-containing receptor for TRAIL", SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, no. 5327, pages 815 - 818, XP002093247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.277.5327.815 | [Y] - CHUNG H.G. ET AL., "Characterization of human homologs of the drosophila seven in absentia (sina) gene", GENOMICS, (1997), vol. 46, no. 1, pages 103 - 111, XP002966823 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1997.4997 | [Y] - "Seibutsu kagaku jikken'ho, series", SHUICHI UENOKAWA ET AL., Idenshi Hatsugen Kenkyuho, JAPAN SCIENTIFIC SOCIETIES PRESS, (20000310), vol. 43, pages 59 - 75, XP002966824 |