EP1430570 - THERMIC PROTECTION ELECTRIC COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pinna, Salvatore Via Cagliari, 19 08100 Nuoro / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Pinna, Salvator Via Cagliari, 19 08100 Nuoro / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/26] | Application number, filing date | 02783521.4 | 23.09.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002IT00603 | Priority number, date | IT2001NU00005 | 24.09.2001 Original published format: IT NU20010005 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03028170 | Date: | 03.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1430570 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/713 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
H01R13/7137 (EP);
H01R13/6683 (EP);
H01R2103/00 (EP);
H01R24/76 (EP);
H01R9/2425 (EP);
H01R9/2625 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2004/26] | Title | German: | THERMOSCHUTZ FÜR EIN ELEKTRISCHES KOMPONENT | [2004/26] | English: | THERMIC PROTECTION ELECTRIC COMPONENT | [2004/26] | French: | COMPOSANT ELECTRIQUE DE PROTECTION THERMIQUE | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 05.04.2006 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 31.10.2006 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.2005 | 30.09.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2006 | 30.09.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 | 30.09.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH06124749 ; | [A]US6210036 (EBERLE GERALD P ET AL) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US4635040 (MASOT OSCAR V) [A] 2-4 * column 2, line 6 - line 19 *; | [A]US5627719 (GASTON WILLIAM R) [A] 5,6 * column 4, line 8 - line 31; figure 3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940803), vol. 018, no. 414, Database accession no. (E - 1587), & JP06124749 A 19940506 (SHIKOKU SOGO KENKYUSHO:KK) [X] 1-6 * abstract * |